Andrews v. D'Souza et al
Plaintiff: Mark Andrews
Defendant: Dinesh DSouza, True the Vote, Inc., Catherine Engelbrecht, Gregg Phillips, DSouza Media LLC, Salem Media Group, Inc., John Does, Dinesh D'Souza, D'Souza Media LLC and Regnery Publishing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv04259
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1985 Conspiracy to interfere with civil rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Andrews. Catherine Engelbrecht waiver mailed on 12/6/2022, answer due 2/6/2023; Gregg Phillips waiver mailed on 12/6/2022, answer due 2/6/2023; True the Vote, Inc. waiver mailed on 12/6/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. (Paredes, Eric John)
December 19, 2022 Filing 35 Return of Service Executed by Mark Andrews. Dinesh D'Souza served on 12/10/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Paredes, Eric John)
December 19, 2022 Filing 34 Return of Service Executed by Mark Andrews. D'Souza Media LLC served on 12/7/2022, answer due 12/28/2022. (Paredes, Eric John)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #31 . Defendants Salem Media Group, Inc. and Regnery Publishing, Inc. shall have to and through January 13, 2023, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/9/2022. (gas)
December 8, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Kyle Byrnside on behalf of Regnery Publishing, Inc., Salem Media Group, Inc. (Byrnside, Ian)
December 8, 2022 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #27 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, by Regnery Publishing, Inc., Salem Media Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint)(Bauer, S.)
December 8, 2022 Filing 30 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Regnery Publishing, Inc.. Regnery Publishing, Inc. served on 12/8/2022. (Bauer, S.)
December 2, 2022 Filing 29 Electronic Summons Issued as to Regnery Publishing Inc. (gas)
December 2, 2022 Filing 28 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Mark Andrews (DuBose, Von)
December 1, 2022 Filing 27 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Mark Andrews.(DuBose, Von) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 28, 2022 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Andrews. Catherine Engelbrecht waiver mailed on 11/14/2022, answer due 1/13/2023; Gregg Phillips waiver mailed on 11/14/2022, answer due 1/13/2023; True the Vote, Inc. waiver mailed on 11/14/2022, answer due 1/13/2023. (DuBose, Von)
November 28, 2022 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed by Mark Andrews. DSouza Media LLC served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (DuBose, Von)
November 28, 2022 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed by Mark Andrews. Dinesh DSouza served on 11/9/2022, answer due 11/30/2022. (DuBose, Von)
November 28, 2022 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed by Mark Andrews. Salem Media Group, Inc. served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (DuBose, Von)
November 16, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Compliance John Paredes, Rachel Goodman, Rachel F. Homer, Jared Fletcher Davidson (DuBose, Von)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rajiv Madan by CRD at the direction of the Office of the Clerk. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/16/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paige Braddy by CRD at the direction of the Office of the Clerk. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/16/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac of Sara Chimene-Weiss by CRD at the direction of the Office of the Clerk. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/16/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lea Haber Kuck by CRD at the direction of the Office of the Clerk. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/16/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc) Modified on 11/16/2022 (slc).
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Vernon Thomas by CRD at the direction of the Office of the Clerk. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/16/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jared F. Davidson by CRD at the direction of the Office of the Clerk. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/16/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Goodman by CRD at the direction of the Office of the Clerk. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/16/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel F. Homer by CRD at the direction of the Office of the Clerk. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/16/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Paredes by CRD at the direction of the Office of the Clerk. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/16/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
November 15, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Jared F. Davidson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12191439). Attorney Jared F. Davidson added appearing on behalf of Mark Andrews (cdg)
November 14, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel Goodman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12185517). Attorney Rachel Goodman added appearing on behalf of Mark Andrews (pdt)
November 14, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel F. Homer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12185528). Attorney Rachel F. Homer added appearing on behalf of Mark Andrews (pdt)
November 14, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of John Paredes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12185495). Attorney John Paredes added appearing on behalf of Mark Andrews (pdt)
November 10, 2022 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Jared F. Davidson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12191439).by Mark Andrews. (DuBose, Von) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 9, 2022 Filing 20 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Jared F. Davidson. Clerk to follow-up by 11/21/2022. (cdg)
November 8, 2022 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel F. Homer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12185528).by Mark Andrews. (DuBose, Von) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 8, 2022 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel Goodman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12185517).by Mark Andrews. (DuBose, Von) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 8, 2022 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of John Paredes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12185495).by Mark Andrews. (DuBose, Von) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 3, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Von A. DuBose, Sara Chimene-Weiss, Lea Haber Kuck, Rajiv Madan, Paige Braddy, Vernon Thomas (DuBose, Von)
November 3, 2022 Refund in the amount of $402.00 has been processed, effective 11/3/2022 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
November 2, 2022 Clerks Approval re #15 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
November 1, 2022 Filing 15 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-12155292. (DuBose, Von)
November 1, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Lea Haber Kuck Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12160438). Attorney Haber Lea Kuck added appearing on behalf of Mark Andrews (pdt)
November 1, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Rajiv Madan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12160463). Attorney Rajiv Madan added appearing on behalf of Mark Andrews (pdt)
November 1, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Paige Braddy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12159923). Attorney Paige Braddy added appearing on behalf of Mark Andrews (pdt)
November 1, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara Chimene-Weiss Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Sara Chimene-Weiss added appearing on behalf of Mark Andrews (pdt)
November 1, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Vernon Thomas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12160492). Attorney Vernon Thomas added appearing on behalf of Mark Andrews (pdt)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/28/2022. (gas)
October 28, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara Chimene-Weiss Pro Hac Vice.by Mark Andrews. (DuBose, Von) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 28, 2022 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara Chimene-Weiss Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12158250) to attorney for correction. Re: List residential address and all admitted courts. (pdt)
October 27, 2022 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Vernon Thomas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12160492).by Mark Andrews. (DuBose, Von) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 27, 2022 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Rajiv Madan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12160463).by Mark Andrews. (DuBose, Von) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 27, 2022 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Lea Haber Kuck Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12160438).by Mark Andrews. (DuBose, Von) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 27, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Paige Braddy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12159923).by Mark Andrews. (DuBose, Von) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 26, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara Chimene-Weiss Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12158250).by Mark Andrews. (DuBose, Von) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 26, 2022 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to True the Vote, Inc. (gas)
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Salem Media Group, Inc. (gas)
October 26, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Gregg Phillips. (gas)
October 26, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Catherine Engelbrecht. (gas)
October 26, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to DSouza Media LLC. (gas)
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Dinesh DSouza. (gas)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mark Andrews. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12156667) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. D'Souza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Andrews
Represented By: Von A. DuBose
Represented By: John Paredes
Represented By: Paige Braddy
Represented By: Rachel Goodman
Represented By: Rachel F. Homer
Represented By: Rajiv Madan
Represented By: Sara Chimene-Weiss
Represented By: Vernon Thomas
Represented By: Haber Lea Kuck
Represented By: Jared F. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinesh DSouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True the Vote, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Engelbrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSouza Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Media Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Kyle Byrnside
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinesh D'Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'Souza Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regnery Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Ian Kyle Byrnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?