Securities and Exchange Commission v. Arbab et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Syed Arham Arbab, Tomas Javier Jimenez, Blake Douglas McKinney, Mushfiqur Rahman, John Ryan Shows and William Carl Spagnoli
Case Number: 1:2022cv04321
Filed: October 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Victoria M Calvert
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Mushfiqur Rahman waiver mailed on 11/1/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Loomis, Madison)
November 30, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Syed Arham Arbab waiver mailed on 11/1/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Loomis, Madison)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. William Carl Spagnoli Answer due 1/20/2023. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on November 30, 2022. (lwb)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by William Carl Spagnoli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint)(Persons, Ellen) Modified on 11/30/2022 (lwb).
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. William Carl Spagnoli served on 11/9/2022, answer due 11/30/2022. (Murnahan, W.)
October 31, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Syed Arham Arbab, Mushfiqur Rahman, William Carl Spagnoli. (Attachments: #1 Summons Rahman, #2 Summons Spagnoli)(ceo)
October 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Defendant Blake Douglas McKinney, #2 Proposed Final Judgment as to of Defendant Blake Douglas McKinney, #3 Consent of Defendant John Ryan Shows, #4 Proposed Final Judgment as to of Defendant John Ryan Shows, #5 Consent of Defendant Tomas Javier Jimenez, #6 Proposed Final Judgment as to Defendant Tomas Javier Jimenez, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Arbab et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Brian Michael Basinger
Represented By: Madison Graham Loomis
Represented By: W. Shawn Murnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syed Arham Arbab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomas Javier Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Douglas McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mushfiqur Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ryan Shows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Carl Spagnoli
Represented By: Ellen Harris Persons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?