Oliver v. Conqueror Trans, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Oliver
Defendant: Conqueror Trans, LLC, Curtis Briggs and State National Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv04487
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Victoria M Calvert
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Remand to State Court of Gwinnett County. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on January 5, 2023. (lwb)
January 5, 2023 Civil Case Terminated. (lwb)
January 5, 2023 Case electronically transmitted to the State Court of Gwinnett County. (lwb)
December 14, 2022 Filing 16 Initial Disclosures by Curtis Briggs, Conqueror Trans, LLC.(Stone, Matthew)
December 14, 2022 Filing 15 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Curtis Briggs, Conqueror Trans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stone, Matthew)
December 14, 2022 Filing 14 Initial Disclosures by Pamela Oliver.(Futrell, J.)
December 7, 2022 Filing 13 Electronic Summons Issued as to Conqueror Trans, LLC. (lwb)
December 6, 2022 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Pamela Oliver (Futrell, J.)
December 5, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Pamela Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support)(Futrell, J.)
December 1, 2022 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Conqueror Trans, LLC. (lwb)
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by State National Insurance Company. (Wolak, Jennifer)
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Pamela Oliver. (Futrell, J.)
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Pamela Oliver (Futrell, J.)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Robert R. Wheeler, Jr.. Clerk to follow-up by 12/8/2022. (pdt)
November 17, 2022 Filing 5 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): December 20-January 13, 2023, by Matthew Peter Stone. (Stone, Matthew)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Curtis Briggs. (Stone, Matthew)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Curtis Briggs.(Stone, Matthew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by State National Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 4/10/2023. (Originally filed in State Court of Gwinnett County on 10/19/2022)(nmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Curtis Briggs. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12191857) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Filings, #2 Exhibit Business Search, #3 Exhibit Corporation Search, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Conqueror Trans, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Oliver
Represented By: J. Martin Futrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conqueror Trans, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Briggs
Represented By: Aleksandra Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew Peter Stone
Represented By: Shawn N. Kalfus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State National Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer W. Wolak
Represented By: Robert Richard Wheeler, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?