Shibeshi v. E*Trade Securities, LLC
Plaintiff: Mesfin Solomon Shibeshi
Defendant: E*Trade Securities, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv04603
Filed: November 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010 Application to Vacate Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ETrade Securities, LLC.(Smith, Andrew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 6, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #4 Order to Show Cause, filed by ETrade Securities, LLC. (Smith, Andrew)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Defendant's #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, up to and including 12/9/2022, for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/28/2022. (bgt)
November 24, 2022 Filing 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by ETrade Securities, LLC. (Smith, Andrew)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant is therefore DIRECTED to SHOW CAUSE within 14 days of the entry of this Order why this case should not be remanded to the Superior Court of Gwinnett County for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Failure to timely file a response showing cause shall result in immediate remand. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit the matter to the undersigned upon expiration of the briefing period. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/22/22. (jra)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/22/2022. (bnp)
November 18, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by ETrade Securities, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Corporate Parent ETCM Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC for ETrade Securities, LLC. (ane)
November 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by ETrade Securities, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12209585) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shibeshi v. E*Trade Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mesfin Solomon Shibeshi
Represented By: Andrew M. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Securities, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Zachery Ryan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?