McCurley v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Ryan McCurley
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA, Housing and Urban Development, Arseni Zaitsev, corrupt and negligent regulators known and unknown and others and Randal Alonso Mangham
Case Number: 1:2022cv04976
Filed: December 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Geraghty
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2023 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew Ryan McCurley. (ane)
January 25, 2023 Submission of #3 MOTION to Request Electronic Pacer Access or to Move the Court to Compel Action by Attorney Randal Alonso Mangham Otherwise Issue Order to Allow US Marshalls to Perform Service on All Known Witnesses to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
January 19, 2023 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank NA identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company (WFC) for Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Ebbs, Arthur)
January 18, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Ebbs, Arthur)
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 Proof of Service and MOTION to Request Electronic Pacer Access or to Move the Court to Compel Action by Attorney Randal Alonso Mangham Otherwise Issue Order to Allow US Marshalls to Perform Service on All Known Witnesses by Matthew Ryan McCurley. (ane)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 12/22/2022. (ane)
December 22, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Matthew Ryan McCurley re #2 Order. (ane)
December 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Matthew Ryan McCurley. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100000387) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCurley v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Ryan McCurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Arthur Allen Ebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arseni Zaitsev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: corrupt and negligent regulators known and unknown and others
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randal Alonso Mangham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?