Securities and Exchange Commission v. Molen et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Enviro Impact Resources, Inc., Michael K. Molen, Industry Source Consulting, Inc., Seth M. Molen and Pixel Arcanum, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00735
Filed: February 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Motions Seeking Disgorgement and Penalties #8 . For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiff shall have 60 days to file the motions. If Plaintiff needs additional time at the end of the 60-day period, they shall contact the Court. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/3/23. (jra)
April 3, 2023 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Motions Seeking Disgorgement and Penalties by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Hicks, William)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Consistent with the terms of the Consent Judgments entered in this case, if the SEC is seeking disgorgement and/or civil penalties, any such motions shall be filed within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/30/23. (ceo)
March 30, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT JUDGMENT as to Enviro Impact Resources, Inc. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/30/23. (ceo)
March 30, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT JUDGMENT as to Michael K. Molen. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/30/23. (ceo)
March 30, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT JUDGMENT as to Pixel Arcanum, Inc. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/30/23. (ceo)
March 30, 2023 Filing 3 CONSENT JUDGMENT as to Seth Molen. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/30/23. (ceo)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/21/2023. (bnp)
February 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Defendant Michael K. Molen, #2 Judgment as to Defendant Michael K. Molen, #3 Consent of Defendant Enviro Impact Resources, Inc., f/k/a Industry Source Consu, #4 Judgment as to Defendant Enviro Impact Resources, Inc., f/k/a Industry Source C, #5 Consent of Defendant Seth M. Molen, #6 Judgment as to Defendant Seth M. Molen, #7 Consent of Defendant Pixel Arcanum, Inc., #8 Judgment as to Defendant Pixel Arcanum, Inc, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Molen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enviro Impact Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K. Molen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industry Source Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth M. Molen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pixel Arcanum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: William P. Hicks
Represented By: Madison Graham Loomis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?