Ledet v. Vandamm Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: George Ledet
Defendant: Vandamm Enterprises, LLC, Thomas Chorey, Jr., Daniel White, Tower Financial LLC, Jeff Solomon, Repurposed BTY LLC, Todd Westfall, Jay D. Kessler, Brian Food INC, Penelope M. Jewell, Judge Adele P. Gurbbs, Tower Financial Services LLC, Keith Hoffman, Resurgens Bank, Charles Dewitt, Prime Equity Lending INC, Fred Wachter, Neighbors Bank, Neighbors Bancshares INC, Phil Baldwin, Realty Resources Corp, Ron Lipsitz, David Markowitz, Michael A. Brochstein, Home American Credit, INC, Anthony Santilli, Jr., Morris & Schnieder, Weiss & Kala LLC, Arthur J. Morris, Cobb County Board of Commissioners, Lisa Cupid, The State of Georgia and Chris Carr
Case Number: 1:2023cv01186
Filed: March 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2023 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to George Ledet re #6 Clerk's Judgment, #5 Order returned via USPS marked "Return to Sender". (ddm)
April 12, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this action (Amended to corrected incorrect case number in caption.) (rsg)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
April 12, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George Ledet re #7 Amended Clerk's Judgment. (rsg)
April 7, 2023 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this action (rsg)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order to Dismiss. The court determines that Plaintiff has failed to plead a non-frivolous Section 1983 claim. The Court, moreover, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the other state law claims without any remaining federal question at issue. Thus, the Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's remaining state law claims of invasion of privacy, abuse of process, forgery, identity theft, receiving stolen property, intentional interference, conspiracy/fraud, and elder abuse for lack of jurisdiction Accordingly, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and DIRECTS the Clerk to close the case. Because Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of the Order. If the Plaintiff files such an amended complaint in the time allowed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reopen the case and resubmit the matter to the Court for a frivolity review. The Court warns Plaintiff that a failure to correct the deficiencies identified in this Order may result in a dismissal of the claims with prejudice. See Bryant v. Dupree, 252 F.3d 1161, 1163 (11th Cir. 2001). Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 04/07/2023. (rsg)
April 7, 2023 Civil Case Terminated. (rsg)
April 7, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George Ledet re #6 Clerk's Judgment, #5 Order to Dismiss. (rsg)
April 5, 2023 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Marked As: Illegible, RTS. Mail sent to George Ledet re #2 Order ruling on IFP, (rsg)
March 21, 2023 Filing 3 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by George Ledet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 Plaintiff's Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and directing the Clerk to submit this action to the District Judge for review of his request for injunctive relief and review of his complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 03/21/2023. (ddm)
March 21, 2023 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (ddm)
March 21, 2023 Submission of #3 Complaint for review of his request for injunctive relief and review of complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (ddm)
March 21, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George Ledet re #2 Order. (ddm)
March 20, 2023 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by George Ledet. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Request to Proceed Without Prepayment, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledet v. Vandamm Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Ledet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vandamm Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Chorey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repurposed BTY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Westfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay D. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Food INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penelope M. Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Adele P. Gurbbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower Financial Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgens Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Dewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Equity Lending INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Wachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neighbors Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neighbors Bancshares INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realty Resources Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Lipsitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Brochstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home American Credit, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Santilli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Schnieder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weiss & Kala LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb County Board of Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Cupid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?