A.J. et al v. MASP, LLC
Plaintiff: A.J. and Q.C.
Defendant: MASP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv04247
Filed: September 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1589 Forced Labor, Sex Trafficking
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2023 Filing 14 Initial Disclosures by MASP, LLC.(Merrill, Marissa)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #11 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned to a six-month discovery period. Discovery shall open on November 16, 2023, and close on May 16, 2024. Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than June 17, 2024. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/9/2023. (ane)
November 7, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures by A.J., Q.C..(Tonge, Jonathan)
November 6, 2023 Filing 11 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by A.J., Q.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Patrick)
November 3, 2023 Clerk's Notation re #9 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
October 17, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marissa Holly Merrill on behalf of MASP, LLC (Merrill, Marissa)
October 17, 2023 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by MASP, LLC. (Wagner, Kori)
October 17, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by MASP, LLC. Discovery ends on 3/15/2024.(Wagner, Kori) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 10/19/2023 (nmb).
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/12/2023. (jkl)
October 10, 2023 Submission of #5 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Q.C., A.J.. MASP, LLC served on 9/27/2023, answer due 10/18/2023. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 25, 2023 Clerk's Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
September 21, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously with Brief In Support by A.J., Q.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Patrick)
September 21, 2023 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.J., Q.C.. (McDonough, Patrick)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/21/2023. (jkl)
September 20, 2023 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to MASP, LLC. (jkb)
September 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Q.C., A.J. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12898053) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.J. et al v. MASP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.J.
Represented By: Jonathan Tonge
Represented By: Patrick J. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q.C.
Represented By: Jonathan Tonge
Represented By: Patrick J. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASP, LLC
Represented By: Tracy Anne Gilmore
Represented By: Kori Wagner
Represented By: Marissa Holly Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?