Lyons v. Wilson
Plaintiff: Kesha Lyons
Defendant: PMAlliance, Inc. and Jay R. Wilson
Case Number: 1:2023cv05057
Filed: November 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: John K Larkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Race Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF re #5 First MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Kesha Lyons. (Johnson-Alford, Ashley)
December 19, 2023 Submission of #5 First MOTION to Amend Complaint, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (pdw)
December 13, 2023 Submission of #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (rsg)
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 First MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Jay R. Wilson. (Johnson, Michelle)
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jay R. Wilson. (Johnson, Michelle)
December 6, 2023 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Anna Reed Fasheyide. Clerk to follow-up by 12/18/2023. (cpp) Modified on 12/14/2023 attorney was admitted 12/12/2023. (rvb).
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kesha Lyons. (Johnson-Alford, Ashley)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 First MOTION to Amend Complaint with Brief In Support by Kesha Lyons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson-Alford, Ashley)
November 20, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Jay R. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Johnson, Michelle)
November 10, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jay R. Wilson. (Johnson, Michelle)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Superior Court of Fulton County re: Order if Dismissal as to PMAlliance, Inc., and Order as to Wilson. It is ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to PMAlliance, Inc. The Motion is hereby GRANTED and the style of the case shall be corrected to show that Defendants name is JAY R. WILSON. (Filed in Superior Court of Fulton County 10/23/2023 and included with Notice of Removal) (dnb)
November 2, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Jay Wilson. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-13006217) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kesha Lyons
Represented By: Ashley Johnson-Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMAlliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay R. Wilson
Represented By: Michelle W. Johnson
Represented By: Anna Reed Fasheyide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?