Ramey v. City of Jonesboro, Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Viniciceson Ramey
Defendant: City of Jonesboro, Georgia and Daweed Yisrael
Case Number: 1:2023cv05235
Filed: November 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Cobb, Larry)
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by City of Jonesboro, Georgia.(Cobb, Larry) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 12, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa M. Beller on behalf of Daweed Yisrael (Beller, Marisa)
January 12, 2024 Filing 8 Defendant Daweed Yisrael's Answer and Defenses ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Daweed Yisrael. Discovery ends on 6/10/2024.(Choy, Sun) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File Out-of-Time Pleadings. Defendants are permitted to file responsive pleadings by January 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/5/2024. (jeh)
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Out-of-Time Responsive Pleadings with Brief In Support by City of Jonesboro, Georgia, Daweed Yisrael. (Pearson, Todd)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Viniciceson Ramey (Felton, Eugene)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT by Viniciceson Ramey. (Felton, Eugene)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Daweed Yisrael. (jkb)
November 14, 2023 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to City of Jonesboro, Georgia. (jkb)
November 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Viniciceson Ramey. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-13030705) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramey v. City of Jonesboro, Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viniciceson Ramey
Represented By: Eugene Felton, Jr
Represented By: George Brian Spears
Represented By: Jeffrey Filipovits
Represented By: Wingo F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jonesboro, Georgia
Represented By: Larry G. Cobb
Represented By: Todd Orlando Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daweed Yisrael
Represented By: Marisa M. Beller
Represented By: Sun S. Choy
Represented By: Todd Orlando Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?