Doe v. Georgia Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections, Commissioner Tyrone Oliver, Randy Sauls, Sharon Lewis, DeShawn Jones, Sergeant Jamal Kinte Roberts, MHM Correctional Services, Inc. doing business as MHM Services, Inc., Centurion Health, Chad I. Lohman, Rhonda Billings, Dr. Skibinski, Dr. Cleary, Dr. Bowling, Sidney Moore, Dr. W. Ausborn, Jeremy Lane, Wellpath LLC, Latonya James, Dr. Anthony Mulloy and Jewellann Clarke
Amicus Curiae: United States, Network for Victim Recovery of DC (NVRDC) and ACLU of Georgia
Case Number: 1:2023cv05578
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2024 Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #86 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #87 Notice of Filing,, with Brief In Support by W. Ausborn, Rhonda Billings, Bowling, Centurion Health, Jewellann Clarke, Cleary, Georgia Department of Corrections, Latonya James, DeShawn Jones, Jeremy Lane, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, MHM Correctional Services, Inc., Sidney Moore, Anthony Mulloy, Tyrone Oliver, Jamal Kinte Roberts, Randy Sauls, Skibinski, Wellpath LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2024 Filing 87 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Vaseliou Declaration and Exhibits by W. Ausborn, Rhonda Billings, Bowling, Centurion Health, Jewellann Clarke, Cleary, Georgia Department of Corrections, Latonya James, DeShawn Jones, Jeremy Lane, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, MHM Correctional Services, Inc., Sidney Moore, Anthony Mulloy, Tyrone Oliver, Jamal Kinte Roberts, Randy Sauls, Skibinski, Wellpath LLC re #86 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Harris, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2024 Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by W. Ausborn, Rhonda Billings, Bowling, Centurion Health, Jewellann Clarke, Cleary, Georgia Department of Corrections, Latonya James, DeShawn Jones, Jeremy Lane, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, MHM Correctional Services, Inc., Sidney Moore, Anthony Mulloy, Tyrone Oliver, Jamal Kinte Roberts, Randy Sauls, Skibinski, Wellpath LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Holt Declaration, #2 Exhibit Jones Declaration, #3 Exhibit Mulloy Declaration, #4 Exhibit Parks Declaration, #5 Exhibit Skibinski Declaration, #6 Exhibit Levine Declaration, #7 Exhibit Kaliebe Declaration)(Harris, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING Defendants #84 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Consolidated Response and Brief in Excess of Page Limits. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/29/2024. (kng)
January 29, 2024 Filing 84 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Consolidated Response and Brief in Excess of Page Limits with Brief In Support by W. Ausborn, Rhonda Billings, Bowling, Centurion Health, Jewellann Clarke, Cleary, Georgia Department of Corrections, Latonya James, DeShawn Jones, Jeremy Lane, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, MHM Correctional Services, Inc., Sidney Moore, Anthony Mulloy, Tyrone Oliver, Jamal Kinte Roberts, Randy Sauls, Skibinski, Wellpath LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2024 Submission of #70 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Briefin support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpk)
January 25, 2024 Filing 83 SEALED Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Jane Doe for 2/12/2024. (jpk) (jpk).
January 25, 2024 Filing 82 SEALED per 1/25/2024 docket order NOTICE Of Filing by Jane Doe re #75 Order on Motion for Relief, #81 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #75 Order on Motion for Relief PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM UNDER SEAL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Writ Order)(Utter, David) Modified on 1/25/2024 to edit text (jpk).
January 25, 2024 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #75 Order on Motion for Relief Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to File Application for Writ Of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Under Seal by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Insert-Application for writ, #2 Appendix Proposed Writ Insert)(Utter, David) Modified to remove capitalization on 1/26/2024 (kng).
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting Plaintiff's #81 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/25/2024. (jpk)
January 25, 2024 Submission of #67 MOTION to Redact and Substitute Exhibits re #4 MOTION for Leave to File Appendix in Support Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction(R. Doc. 2), #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpk)
January 23, 2024 Filing 80 Redaction of #64 Transcript, (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (jbc)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #78 Motion to Redact #64 Transcript. The Court will redact the following lines from the public version of the transcript of the December 11, 2023 hearing (Dkt. 64): page 28 lines 13 through 23. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/23/2024. (tas)
January 19, 2024 Filing 78 MOTION to Redact #64 Transcript, by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A-Transcript_ Doe v Department of Corrections, et al. Final_Redacted)(Utter, David)
January 19, 2024 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Geoffrey Frankson on behalf of W. Ausborn, Rhonda Billings, Bowling, Cleary, Jeremy Lane, Sidney Moore, Skibinski (Frankson, Michael)
January 12, 2024 Filing 76 Certificate of Consent to Withdraw Francesca Eick as Attorney by Jane Doe. (Eick, Francesca) Modified on 2/1/2024 to edit text (jpk).
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously and Motion for Leave to File Documents Revealing Identity Under Seal. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/12/2024. (kng)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's #73 Motion to Render Interim Relief In Advance of February 12, 2024 Preliminary Injunction Hearing. She may refile her motion as one for a TRO or for separate injunctive relief from that she seeks in her prior preliminary injunction motion. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/11/2024. (kng)
January 9, 2024 Filing 73 MOTION for Relief to Render Interim Relief in Advance of February 12, 2024 Preliminary Injunction Hearing with Brief In Support by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A - 2023.12.22 Interim Relief Letter Requests, #4 Exhibit B - 2024.01.05 Response to Interim Relief Request, #5 Exhibit C - Email reply to Defendants' Response, #6 Exhibit D - Defendants' Jan. 7 Email, #7 Exhibit E - Defendants' Jan. 9 Email, #8 Exhibit F - Commissary Master Product List 2023, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Utter, David) Modified to remove capitalization on 1/11/2024 (kng).
January 9, 2024 Filing 72 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Injunction Opposition and Continue Hearing by Georgia Department of Corrections, DeShawn Jones, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, Anthony Mulloy, Tyrone Oliver, Randy Sauls. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tucker, Rachael)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) denying Defendants' #72 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Preliminary Injunction Opposition and Continue Hearing. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/9/2024. (jpk)
January 8, 2024 Filing 71 NOTICE Of Filing Brief of Amicus Curiae ACLU of Georgia in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by ACLU of Georgia (Spielman, Brian)
January 8, 2024 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Briefin support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Network for Victim Recovery of DC (NVRDC). (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fox, Melissa)
January 8, 2024 Filing 69 STATEMENT of Interest by United States . (Hughes, Aileen) Modified on 1/10/2024 to remove all caps text (adg).
January 8, 2024 Submission of #61 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #60 Notice of Filing to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpk)
January 4, 2024 Filing 68 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION for Relief to Proceed Anonymously and Seal Identity filed by Jane Doe. (Palmieri, Nicholas)
January 4, 2024 Filing 67 MOTION Motion to Redact and Substitute Exhibits #4 MOTION for Leave to File Appendix in Support Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction(R. Doc. 2), #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Redact and Substitute Exhibits, #2 Brief Proposed Redacted Memorandum of Law Dkt 2-1, #3 Appendix Proposed Redacted Appendix Part 1- Dkt 4-2)(Utter, David) Modified to remove double wording on 1/4/2024 (kng).
January 3, 2024 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffiny Montenegro on behalf of Jewellann Clarke, Latonya James, Wellpath LLC (Montenegro, Tiffiny)
January 3, 2024 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Boone on behalf of Jewellann Clarke, Latonya James, Wellpath LLC (Boone, Beth)
December 28, 2023 Filing 64 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Status Conference) held on December 11, 2023, before Judge Michael L. Brown. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jana B. Colter. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Redaction requests are due within 21 days of entry. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Official Transcript) (bgt)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #8 MOTION to Strike R. Doc 4-1 and Substitute Corrected Proposed Order. R. Doc. 4-1 shall be substituted for the Corrected Proposed Order submitted with Plaintiff's present pleading. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/28/2023. (kng)
December 28, 2023 Submission of #8 MOTION to Strike R. Doc 4-1 and Substitute Corrected Proposed Order to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpk)
December 27, 2023 Filing 62 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe. Anthony Mulloy served on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. Served with Summons, Docket, Complaint, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Memorandum, MOTION for Leave to File Appendix in Support Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Relief to Proceed Anonymously and Seal Identity with Brief In Support by Jane Doe, Submission of 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation, MOTION to Expedite Hearing, MOTION to Strike, NOTICE Of Filing Unredacted Exhibits, MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal, Order, Set Hearings , as to Anthony Mulloy. (Murell, Christopher) Modified to accurately reflect e-filed document on 12/28/2023 (kng).
December 27, 2023 Submission of #10 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #9 Notice of Filing to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpk)
December 21, 2023 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #60 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by W. Ausborn, Rhonda Billings, Bowling, Centurion Health, Cleary, Georgia Department of Corrections, DeShawn Jones, Jeremy Lane, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, MHM Correctional Services, Inc., Sidney Moore, Tyrone Oliver, Randy Sauls, Skibinski. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2023 Filing 60 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing by W. Ausborn, Rhonda Billings, Bowling, Centurion Health, Cleary, Georgia Department of Corrections, DeShawn Jones, Jeremy Lane, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, MHM Correctional Services, Inc., Sidney Moore, Tyrone Oliver, Randy Sauls re #59 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Harris, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2023 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Relief to Proceed Anonymously and Seal Identity filed by W. Ausborn, Rhonda Billings, Bowling, Centurion Health, Cleary, Georgia Department of Corrections, DeShawn Jones, Jeremy Lane, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, MHM Correctional Services, Inc., Tyrone Oliver, Randy Sauls, Skibinski. (Harris, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING #55 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas S. Vaseliou. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/20/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING #54 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachael Tucker. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/20/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING #52 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey M. Harris. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/20/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 20, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #58 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Thomas S. Vaseliou. (kng)
December 20, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #55 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas S. Vaseliou Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13104592). Attorney Thomas Samuel Vaseliou added appearing on behalf of Georgia Department of Corrections, DeShawn Jones, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, Tyrone Oliver, Randy Sauls. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
December 20, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #57 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Rachael Tucker. (kng)
December 19, 2023 Filing 55 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas S. Vaseliou Pro Hac Vice.by Georgia Department of Corrections, DeShawn Jones, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, Tyrone Oliver, Randy Sauls. (Petrany, Stephen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 19, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #52 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey M. Harris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13104565). Attorney Jeffrey Matthew Harris added appearing on behalf of Georgia Department of Corrections, DeShawn Jones, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, Tyrone Oliver, Randy Sauls. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
December 19, 2023 RETURN of #53 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas S. Vaseliou Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13104592) to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Residential and business address should not be the same. Please correct and resubmit. (rvb)
December 19, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #54 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachael Tucker Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13104597). Attorney Rachael Tucker added appearing on behalf of Georgia Department of Corrections, DeShawn Jones, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, Tyrone Oliver, Randy Sauls. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
December 18, 2023 Filing 54 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachael Tucker Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13104597).by Georgia Department of Corrections, DeShawn Jones, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, Tyrone Oliver, Randy Sauls. (Petrany, Stephen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 18, 2023 Filing 53 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas S. Vaseliou Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13104592).by Georgia Department of Corrections, DeShawn Jones, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, Tyrone Oliver, Randy Sauls. (Petrany, Stephen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 18, 2023 Filing 52 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey M. Harris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13104565).by Georgia Department of Corrections, DeShawn Jones, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, Tyrone Oliver, Randy Sauls. (Petrany, Stephen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 18, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen John Petrany on behalf of Georgia Department of Corrections, DeShawn Jones, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, Tyrone Oliver, Randy Sauls (Petrany, Stephen)
December 14, 2023 Filing 50 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Lindsey Cassimus. Clerk to follow-up by 12/26/2023. (cpp)
December 11, 2023 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael L. Brown: Status Conference held on 12/11/2023 regarding Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion no later than 1/31/2024. Plaintiff shall file a reply no later than 2/6/2024. The Court SETS a hearing on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction for 2/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1906 before Judge Michael L. Brown. The Court STAYS the answer deadline pending its ruling on the motion. Amicus briefs shall be filed on or before 1/8/2024. Hearing Concluded. (Court Reporter Jana Colter)(kng)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #43 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Roskey. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/11/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 11, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #48 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Hannah Roskey. (kng)
December 11, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #43 APPLICATION for Admission of Hannah Roskey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13081760). Attorney Hannah Roskey added appearing on behalf of Jane Doe. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
December 8, 2023 Filing 47 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe. Wellpath served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. Served Summons, Complaint, Motion for PI, and Related Motions and Filings , as to Wellpath. (Dangaran, D.) Modified to accurately reflect e-filed document on 12/11/2023 (kng).
December 8, 2023 Filing 46 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe. W. Ausborn served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023; Jeremy Lane served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023; MHM Correctional Services, Inc. served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023; Sidney Moore served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Dangaran, D.)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING #35 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas Frank Palmieri, III. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/8/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING #33 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sterling Andrew Marchand. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/8/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 8, 2023 Filing 43 APPLICATION for Admission of Hannah Roskey Pro Hac Vice.by Jane Doe. (Utter, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 8, 2023 Filing 42 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe. Rhonda Billings served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023; Jewellann Clarke served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023; Latonya James served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023; DeShawn Jones served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023; Skibinski served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Murell, Christopher)
December 8, 2023 Filing 41 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe. Bowling served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023; Centurion Health served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023; Cleary served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023; Georgia Department of Corrections served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023; Chad I. Lohman served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023; Tyrone Oliver served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Murell, Christopher)
December 8, 2023 Filing 40 MOTION to Amend #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Hannah Roskey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13081760). Amended/Revised APPLICATION for Admission of Hannah Roskey Pro Hac Vice by Jane Doe. (Utter, David)
December 8, 2023 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael L. Brown: Telephone Conference held on 12/8/2023. Discussion had regarding pro hac vice requirements for local counsel. The Court GRANTED Plaintiff's #28 Motion to Proceed with December 11, 2023 Hearing. Hearing Concluded. (Court Reporter Keisha Crump)(kng)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meghan Matt. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/8/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine Jeffress. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/8/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Miriam R. Nemeth. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/8/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 8, 2023 Filing 35 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicholas Frank Palmieri,III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13085216).by Jane Doe. (Utter, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of D. Dangaran. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/8/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 8, 2023 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Admission of Sterling Andrew Marchand Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13085157).by Jane Doe. (Utter, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ronald Scott Novak, Jr. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/8/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Francesca Eick. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/8/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kng)
December 8, 2023 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Sharon Lewis waiver mailed on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024; Chad I. Lohman waiver mailed on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024; Randy Sauls waiver mailed on 12/8/2023, answer due 2/6/2024. (Murell, Christopher)
December 8, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger A. Chalmers on behalf of Georgia Department of Corrections, DeShawn Jones, Sharon Lewis, Chad I. Lohman, Tyrone Oliver, Randy Sauls (Chalmers, Roger)
December 8, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION for Relief Seeking Leave to Proceed with Dec 11 Hearing with Noticed Defendants by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murell, Christopher) Modified to remove capitalization on 12/11/2023 (kng).
December 8, 2023 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe. MHM Services Inc. served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. Served Summons, Complaint, Motion for PI, and Related Motions and Filings , as to MHM Services, Inc. (Murell, Christopher) Modified to accurately reflect e-filed document on 12/11/2023 (kng).
December 8, 2023 Filing 26 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe. Centurion Health served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. Served Summons, Complaint, Motion for PI, and Related Motions and Filings , as to Centurion Health. (Murell, Christopher) Modified to accurately reflect e-filed document on 12/11/2023 (kng).
December 8, 2023 Filing 25 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Nicholas Palmieri. Clerk to follow-up by 12/18/2023. (cpp)
December 8, 2023 Filing 24 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Sterling Marchand. Clerk to follow-up by 12/18/2023. (cpp)
December 8, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #32 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Ronald Scott Novak, Jr. (kng)
December 8, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #45 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Nicholas Frank Palmieri, III. (kng)
December 8, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #33 APPLICATION for Admission of Sterling Andrew Marchand Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13085157). Attorney Sterling Andrew Marchand added appearing on behalf of Jane Doe. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
December 8, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #35 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicholas Frank Palmieri,III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13085216). Attorney Nicholas Frank Palmieri, III added appearing on behalf of Jane Doe. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
December 8, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #38 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Meghan Matt. (kng)
December 8, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #37 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Katherine Jeffress. (kng)
December 8, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #34 Order on Application for Admission PHV D. Dangaran. (kng)
December 8, 2023 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE PROCEEDING (by docket entry only): The Court SETS a conference call for 12/8/2023 at 12:30 PM (EST) via Zoom before Judge Michael L. Brown. All of plaintiff's attorneys, including local counsel, must be on the call. Connection Instructions: Join ZoomGov Meeting https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1601741539. Meeting ID: 160 174 1539. Passcode: 103915. Telephone Number: 646-828-7666. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (jpk)
December 8, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Francesca Eick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13081714). Attorney Francesca Eick added appearing on behalf of Jane Doe. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
December 8, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Ronald Scott Novak, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13081724). Attorney Ronald Scott Novak, Jr. added appearing on behalf of Jane Doe. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
December 8, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Meghan Matt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13082895). Attorney Meghan Matt added appearing on behalf of Jane Doe. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
December 8, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #44 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Sterling Andrew Marchand. (kng)
December 8, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #31 Order on Application for Admission PHV to Francesca Eick. (kng)
December 8, 2023 RETURN of #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Hannah Roskey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13081760). to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Applicant failed to list the courts she is admitted. Applicant must include the U.S. District court(s) and/or the highest state court(s) to which she is admitted on her application. List the state bar information is not sufficient. (rvb)
December 8, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Katherine Jeffress Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13081753). Attorney Katherine Jeffress added appearing on behalf of Jane Doe. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
December 8, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of D Dangaran Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13081729). Attorney D. Dangaran added appearing on behalf of Jane Doe. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only): The Court held a telephonic hearing with Plaintiff Jane Doe's counsel to discuss a technical issuing involving several pending pro hac vice motions. A court reporter was present and a transcript of the hearing can be made available to the Defendants upon request. Having reviewed Plaintiff Doe's Motion for Leave to Proceed with December 11, 2023 Hearing with Noticed Defendants (Dkt. 28) and remaining mindful of Plaintiff Doe's request for expedited relief, the Court reaffirms the hearing currently scheduled for December 11, 2023 at 4:30 p.m. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/8/2023. (jpk)
December 8, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Miriam R. Nemeth Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13081743). Attorney Miriam R. Nemeth added appearing on behalf of Jane Doe. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
December 7, 2023 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Meghan Matt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13082895).by Jane Doe. (Utter, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Plaintiff's #12 Motion to Extend Service Deadline and Modify December 6, 2023 Order. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to serve Defendants with the complaint and with all her filings in this case (or obtain waivers of service) by 12:00 p.m. on December 8, 2023. The Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff's out-of-state counsel may represent her at the December 11 hearing without local counsel. Should Plaintiff's local counsel wish to participate, however, they must appear in person. (See Order for further specifics.) Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/7/2023. (jpk)
December 7, 2023 Filing 21 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (kng)
December 7, 2023 Filing 20 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Meghan Matt. Clerk to follow-up by 12/18/2023. (djs)
December 7, 2023 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Hannah Roskey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13081760).by Jane Doe. (Utter, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 7, 2023 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Katherine Jeffress Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13081753).by Jane Doe. (Utter, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 7, 2023 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Miriam R. Nemeth Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13081743).by Jane Doe. (Utter, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 7, 2023 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of D Dangaran Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13081729).by Jane Doe. (Utter, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 7, 2023 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Ronald Scott Novak, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13081724).by Jane Doe. (Utter, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Francesca Eick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13081714).by Jane Doe. (Utter, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Jane Doe Notice of Filing Summons to be Issued by the Clerk of Court (Attachments: #1 Summons Anthony Mulloy- GDC, #2 Summons Chad Lohman- GDC Central, #3 Summons Dr. Bowling- GDC, #4 Summons Ga. Department of Corrections, #5 Summons Randy Sauls- GDC Central, #6 Summons Sharon Lewis- GDC Central, #7 Summons Tyrone Oliver- GDC Central, #8 Summons Centurion Health, #9 Summons Chad Lohman- Centurion, #10 Summons Dr. Bowling- Centurion, #11 Summons Dr. Cleary- Centurion, #12 Summons Dr. Skibinski- Centurion, #13 Summons Dr. W. Ausborn- Centurion, #14 Summons Jeremy Lane- Centurion, #15 Summons MHM- Centurion, #16 Summons Rhonda Billings- Centurion, #17 Summons Sidney Moore- Centurion, #18 Summons DeShawn Jones -PSP, #19 Summons Dr. Cleary-PSP, #20 Summons Dr. Skibinski-PSP, #21 Summons Jamal Kinte Roberts-PSP, #22 Summons Jewellann Clarke-PSP, #23 Summons Latonya James-PSP, #24 Summons Rhonda Billings-PSP, #25 Summons Anthony Mulloy- Well Path, #26 Summons Jewellann Clarke- Well Path, #27 Summons Latonya James- Well Path, #28 Summons Well Path)(Utter, David) Modified to remove capitalization on 12/11/2023 (kng).
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time re #11 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, Order on Motion to Expedite, MOTION to Extend Service Deadline and Modify December 6, 2023 Order by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Motion to Extend Service Deadline and Modify December 6, 2023 Order)(Utter, David) Modified to remove capitalization on 12/8/2023 (kng).
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Expedited Hearing on Preliminary Injunction and SETS a hearing on Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction for December 11, 2023, at 4:30 p.m., to take place before the Honorable Michael L. Brown, in Courtroom 1906, Richard B. Russell Federal Building, 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW, Atlanta, Georgia 30303. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as untimely, given that she filed her oversized brief in support of her motion for preliminary injunction before the Court ruled on the motion for leave. Plaintiff should not do that again. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to serve Defendants with a copy of the complaint and all of her filings in this case on or before December 7, 2023, at 12:00 p.m. (See Order for further specifics.) Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/6/2023. (jpk)
December 6, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #9 Notice of Filing,, by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murell, Christopher)
December 6, 2023 Filing 9 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Unredacted Exhibits by Jane Doe re #4 MOTION for Leave to File Appendix in Support Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction(R. Doc. 2) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Exh. 2 - Affidavit from Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Exh. 8 - Partial Grievances, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Exh. 9 - Letter to Centurion Health, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Exh. 12 - Medical Records, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Exh. 13 - Sealed Prior Case)(Murell, Christopher)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike R. Doc 4-1 and Substitute Corrected Proposed Order by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Corrected Proposed Order for R. Doc. 4-1)(Murell, Christopher)
December 6, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murell, Christopher)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
December 6, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Relief to Proceed Anonymously and Seal Identity with Brief In Support by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Murell, Christopher)
December 6, 2023 Filing 4 STRUCK DOC. 4-1 PER #63 ORDER MOTION for Leave to File Appendix in Support Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction(R. Doc. 2) by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Appendix Part 1, #3 Appendix Part 2, #4 Appendix Part 3)(Murell, Christopher) Modified to remove double wording on 12/7/2023 (kng). Modified on 12/29/2023 (kng).
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Leave to File Excess Pages)(kng)
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Placeholder for Appendix in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction)(kng)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jane Doe. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13075996) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kng) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
December 6, 2023 Set Hearings: Preliminary Injunction hearing set for 12/11/2023 at 04:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1906 before Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpk)
December 6, 2023 Submission of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, #4 MOTION for Leave to File Appendix in Support Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (R. Doc. 2) #5 MOTION for Relief to Proceed Anonymously and Seal Identity to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (kng)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Georgia Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemeth
Represented By: Christopher James Murell
Represented By: David Utter
Represented By: D. Dangaran
Represented By: Francesca Eick
Represented By: Hannah Roskey
Represented By: Katherine Elise Jeffress
Represented By: Meghan K. Matt
Represented By: Nicholas Frank Palmieri, III
Represented By: Ronald Scott Novak, Jr.
Represented By: Sterling Andrew Marchand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Represented By: Rachael Tucker
Represented By: Thomas Samuel Vaseliou
Represented By: Roger A. Chalmers
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Tyrone Oliver
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Represented By: Rachael Tucker
Represented By: Thomas Samuel Vaseliou
Represented By: Roger A. Chalmers
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Sauls
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Represented By: Rachael Tucker
Represented By: Thomas Samuel Vaseliou
Represented By: Roger A. Chalmers
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Represented By: Rachael Tucker
Represented By: Thomas Samuel Vaseliou
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Represented By: Roger A. Chalmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeShawn Jones
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Represented By: Rachael Tucker
Represented By: Thomas Samuel Vaseliou
Represented By: Roger A. Chalmers
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Jamal Kinte Roberts
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Correctional Services, Inc. doing business as MHM Services, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey Cassimus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Health
Represented By: Lindsey Cassimus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad I. Lohman
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Represented By: Thomas Samuel Vaseliou
Represented By: Rachael Tucker
Represented By: Roger A. Chalmers
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Billings
Represented By: Alexander Collins Vey
Represented By: Lindsey Cassimus
Represented By: Nora M. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Geoffrey Frankson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Skibinski
Represented By: Alexander Collins Vey
Represented By: Lindsey Cassimus
Represented By: Nora M. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Geoffrey Frankson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Cleary
Represented By: Alexander Collins Vey
Represented By: Lindsey Cassimus
Represented By: Nora M. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Geoffrey Frankson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Bowling
Represented By: Alexander Collins Vey
Represented By: Lindsey Cassimus
Represented By: Nora M. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Geoffrey Frankson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Moore
Represented By: Alexander Collins Vey
Represented By: Lindsey Cassimus
Represented By: Nora M. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Geoffrey Frankson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. W. Ausborn
Represented By: Alexander Collins Vey
Represented By: Lindsey Cassimus
Represented By: Nora M. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Geoffrey Frankson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Lane
Represented By: Alexander Collins Vey
Represented By: Lindsey Cassimus
Represented By: Nora M. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Geoffrey Frankson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath LLC
Represented By: Beth Boone
Represented By: Tiffiny Montenegro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latonya James
Represented By: Beth Boone
Represented By: Tiffiny Montenegro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Anthony Mulloy
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Represented By: Rachael Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewellann Clarke
Represented By: Beth Boone
Represented By: Tiffiny Montenegro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States
Represented By: Aileen Bell Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Network for Victim Recovery of DC (NVRDC)
Represented By: Melissa Lorraine Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ACLU of Georgia
Represented By: Brian Spielman
Represented By: Robert C. Khayat, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?