Pittman v. Allen
Plaintiff: Nadira A. Pittman
Defendant: Nicole Allen, Stockbridge Police Department and State of Georgia
Case Number: 1:2024cv01937
Filed: May 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nadira A. Pittman re #20 Order on Application to Appeal in forma pauperis. (jkb)
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #16 Application to Appeal in forma pauperis. Any further requests to appeal IFP should be directed to the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals in accordance with Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 06/26/2024. (jkb)
June 17, 2024 Filing 19 USCA Acknowledgment of #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Nadira A. Pittman. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 24-11958-J. (rlh)
June 12, 2024 Filing 18 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to USCA- 11th Circuit re: #15 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
June 12, 2024 Filing 17 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to USCA- 11th Circuit re: #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Nadira A. Pittman. (pjm)
June 12, 2024 Submission of #16 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (pjm)
June 11, 2024 Filing 16 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis by Nadira A. Pittman. (pjm)
June 11, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #14 Clerk's Judgment and #13 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous by Nadira A. Pittman. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. (pjm)
June 4, 2024 Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (dmb)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS FRIVOLOUS pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 6/4/2024. (dmb)
June 4, 2024 Civil Case Terminated. (dmb)
June 4, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nadira A. Pittman re #14 Clerk's Judgment, and #13 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous. (dmb)
May 28, 2024 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nicole Allen filed by Nadira A. Pittman.(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Pittman is ordered to file an amended complaint within 14 days. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 5/22/2024. (dmb)
May 22, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nadira A. Pittman re #11 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (dmb)
May 17, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Nadira A. Pittman. (dmb)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge and submit this case to the District Judge for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 5/15/2024. (dmb)
May 15, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nadira A. Pittman re #9 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dmb)
May 15, 2024 Submission of #1 Complaint for frivolity determination to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
May 8, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing: Name Correction by Nadira A. Pittman (dmb)
May 8, 2024 Filing 7 AMENDED APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nadira A. Pittman. (dmb)
May 8, 2024 Submission of #7 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (dmb)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is ordered, within 21 days of the date of this Order, to either (1) pay the full filing fee, or (2) submit a complete IFP application using this districts form and answering fully and truthfully all questions posed. Plaintiff is advised that failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action. The Clerk is directed to mail a blank Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) to Plaintiff at 316 Beach 48th Street, Queens, NY 11691. Forms sent to party: Affidavit to Proceed IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 5/3/2024. (dmb)
May 3, 2024 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-03102. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 3, 2024 Submission of #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis., to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (aar)
May 3, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nadira A. Pittman re #6 Order ruling on IFP and Forms Sent. (dmb)
April 25, 2024 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Nadira A. Pittman..(rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/3/2024.]
April 24, 2024 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of Georgia.(ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/3/2024.]
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this court. This order closes the case in this court. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/24/2024) (ks) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/3/2024.]
April 24, 2024 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sgz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/3/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nicole Allen, Stockbridge Police Department, State of Georgia. Document filed by Nadira A. Pittman.(rdz) Modified on 4/24/2024 (rdz). [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/3/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/3/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pittman v. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadira A. Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stockbridge Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?