Ford Motor Company v. Vintage Modern, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Company
Defendant: Vintage Modern, Inc. doing business as Vintage formerly known as Vintage Broncos LLC formerly known as Vintage Broncos, Inc., Vintage Broncos, Inc., Vintage Modern LLC, Vintage Broncos LLC, Chau Nguyen and Vintage Modern Subsidiary, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv04988
Filed: October 31, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2024 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vintage Modern Subsidiary, LLC, Chau Nguyen, Vintage Modern, Inc.. (Huynh, Daniel)
December 16, 2024 Filing 22 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by Vintage Modern Subsidiary, LLC, Chau Nguyen, Vintage Modern, Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/15/2025.(Huynh, Daniel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: This matter having come before the Court upon the parties' Consent Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint ("Consent Motion"), and the Court having considered same and for good cause shown; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Consent Motion is granted; and IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Vintage Modern, Inc., Defendant Vintage Modern Subsidiary, LLC, and Defendant Chau Nguyen may have through and including December 16, 2024 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Ford Motor Company's Complaint. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/21/2024. (tmf)
November 20, 2024 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time For Defendants to Answer or Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint re: #1 Complaint,, #17 Amended Complaint,,, by Vintage Modern Subsidiary, LLC, Chau Nguyen, Vintage Modern, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huynh, Daniel) Modified on 11/21/2024 to edit relief(tmf).
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/20/2024. (tmf)
November 12, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE Of Filing Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company re #17 Amended Complaint,,, (Chollet, Nichole)
November 12, 2024 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - June 3, 2024 Cease and Desist Letter (REDACTED), #2 Exhibit 2 - FORD Trademark Registration Certificates, #3 Exhibit 3 - Ford Saegis Search, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ford Bronco Articles, #5 Exhibit 5 - BRONCO Trademark Registration Certificates, #6 Exhibit 6 - Trade Publication Articles, #7 Exhibit 7 - Examples of Trade Publications Awards, #8 Exhibit 8 - Archive.org capture of VintageBroncos.co, #9 Exhibit 9 - Capture of VintageBroncos.co About Us Page, #10 Exhibit 10 - Capture of Vintage Broncos Instagram, #11 Exhibit 11 - Autotrader Listings for Vintage Broncos, #12 Exhibit 12 - Capture of VintageBroncos.co)(Chollet, Nichole) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 8, 2024 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Ford Motor Company. Chau Nguyen served on 11/5/2024, answer due 11/26/2024. (Chollet, Nichole)
November 7, 2024 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Ford Motor Company. Vintage Modern Subsidiary, LLC served on 11/4/2024, answer due 11/25/2024. (Chollet, Nichole)
November 7, 2024 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Ford Motor Company. Vintage Modern, Inc. served on 11/4/2024, answer due 11/25/2024. (Chollet, Nichole)
November 4, 2024 Filing 13 Electronic Summons Issued as to Chau Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Summons Buford, GA address)(tmf)
November 4, 2024 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to Vintage Modern Subsidiary, LLC. (tmf)
November 4, 2024 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to Vintage Modern, Inc.. (tmf)
November 4, 2024 Filing 10 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (tmf)
November 1, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #8 Notice of Filing Ex. 1 to Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chollet, Nichole)
November 1, 2024 Filing 8 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Document Under Seal (Exhibit 1) by Ford Motor Company re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint (Sealed))(Chollet, Nichole) Modified on 11/20/2024 to edit red text(tmf).
November 1, 2024 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Ford Motor Company (Chau Nguyen) (Chollet, Nichole)
November 1, 2024 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Ford Motor Company (Chau Nguyen) (Chollet, Nichole)
November 1, 2024 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Ford Motor Company (Vintage Modern Subsidiary, LLC) (Chollet, Nichole)
November 1, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Ford Motor Company (Vintage Modern, Inc.) (Chollet, Nichole)
November 1, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate China- Jiangling Motors Corporation, Limited, Other Affiliate Turkey- Ford Otomotiv Sanayi Anonim Sirketi (Ford Otosan) for Ford Motor Company. (Chollet, Nichole)
November 1, 2024 Filing 2 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Chollet, Nichole)
October 31, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13834140) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford Motor Company v. Vintage Modern, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Modern, Inc. doing business as Vintage formerly known as Vintage Broncos LLC formerly known as Vintage Broncos, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Manning Vaughn
Represented By: Eliza Del Carmen
Represented By: Daniel Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Broncos, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Manning Vaughn
Represented By: Eliza Del Carmen
Represented By: Daniel Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Modern LLC
Represented By: Stephen Manning Vaughn
Represented By: Eliza Del Carmen
Represented By: Daniel Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Broncos LLC
Represented By: Stephen Manning Vaughn
Represented By: Eliza Del Carmen
Represented By: Daniel Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Stephen Manning Vaughn
Represented By: Eliza Del Carmen
Represented By: Daniel Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Modern Subsidiary, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Manning Vaughn
Represented By: Eliza Del Carmen
Represented By: Daniel Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Richard Charles Henn, Jr.
Represented By: Nichole Davis Chollet
Represented By: Jessica Truelove
Represented By: Alexander Weathersby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?