Cooper v. Jockey International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lamont D. Cooper
Defendant: Jockey International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2025cv00811
Filed: February 17, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Tiffany R Johnson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 a False representation-goods sold-interstate commer
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2025 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jockey International, Inc.with Jury Demand filed by Lamont D. Cooper.(Katz, Stephen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order ORDER by docket entry only approving #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Dayna Cooper. Approved by Judge Tiffany R Johnson on 3/3/25. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bmr)
March 3, 2025 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re Order on Application for Admission PHV to Dayna Cooper. (bmr)
February 28, 2025 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Dayna C. Cooper Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14103424). Attorney Dayna C. Cooper added appearing on behalf of Lamont D. Cooper. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (mh)
February 27, 2025 Filing 5 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (djs)
February 27, 2025 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Katz, Stephen)
February 27, 2025 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Dayna C. Cooper Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14103424).by Lamont D. Cooper. (Katz, Stephen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 24, 2025 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (djs)
February 18, 2025 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Dayna C. Cooper. Clerk to follow-up by 2/28/2025. (jas)
February 18, 2025 Submission of #1 Complaint, in prayer for relief is preliminary and permanent injunctionto District Judge Tiffany R Johnson. (djs)
February 17, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14070271) filed by Lamont D. Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(djs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Jockey International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont D. Cooper
Represented By: Stephen M. Katz
Represented By: Dayna C. Cooper
Represented By: Dayna C. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jockey International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?