Graves v. ALM Gwinett/Speed Gears, Inc
Plaintiff: Dionte Graves
Defendant: ALM Gwinett/Speed Gears, Inc
Case Number: 1:2025cv00849
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Geraghty
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2025 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing action with prejudice as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). (ane)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
March 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING #3 Final Report and Recommendation. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 3/20/2025. (ane)
March 21, 2025 Civil Case Terminated. (ane)
March 21, 2025 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dionte Graves re #5 Order, #6 Clerk's Judgment. (ane)
March 18, 2025 Submission of #3 Final Report and Recommendation to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/24/2025. (ane)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Complaint, filed by Dionte Graves. Plaintiff's #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED, but the undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action be DISMISSED with prejudice because Plaintiff's claims are frivolous. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/24/2025. (ane)
February 24, 2025 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Dionte Graves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 24, 2025 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dionte Graves re #3 Final Report and Recommendation, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ane)
February 19, 2025 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (gww)
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dionte Graves. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(gww)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graves v. ALM Gwinett/Speed Gears, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionte Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALM Gwinett/Speed Gears, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?