Goggins et al v. Gonzalez-Martinez et al
Plaintiff: Ericka Goggins and Luchion Goggins
Defendant: Yoel Gonzalez-Martinez, YKL Transport, LLC., United States Liability Insurance Company, Brooklyn Specialty Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, Inc. and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2025cv00854
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Victoria M Calvert
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1446 Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2025 Filing 16 Case remanded to Clayton County Superior Court re #15 Order. Filing status: accepted. (jbu) Modified on 4/10/2025 (jbu).
March 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court REMANDS this case to the Superior Court of Clayton County, Georgia for further proceedings. There being no further issues before the Court, the Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 3/31/2025. (jbu)
March 31, 2025 Civil Case Terminated. (jbu)
March 21, 2025 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Brooklyn Specialty Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, Inc., Yoel Gonzalez-Martinez, YKL Transport, LLC.. (Miller, Michael)
March 21, 2025 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Brooklyn Specialty Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, Inc., Yoel Gonzalez-Martinez, YKL Transport, LLC.. Discovery ends on 8/18/2025.(Miller, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 19, 2025 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Scott, Gailya)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Because Defendants have not met their burden of establishing diversity at this time, the Court ORDERS Defendants to SHOW CAUSE, on or before fourteen (14) days from the entry of this Order, why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. To the extent Defendants believe diversity jurisdiction is proper, the Court ORDERS them to amend the Notice of Removal to show compliance with the requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1332. Failure to do so will result in the Court remanding this lawsuit for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to resubmit this matter to the undersigned after expiration of the deadline. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 3/12/2025. (jbu)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting the #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric Fitzgerald. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 3/3/2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jbu)
March 3, 2025 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Eric Fitzgerald re #10 Order on Application for Admission PHV,. (jbu)
March 3, 2025 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Eric Fitzgerald Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14106775). Attorney Eric A. Fitzgerald added appearing on behalf of United States Liability Insurance Company. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (mh)
February 28, 2025 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Eric Fitzgerald Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14106775).by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Scott, Gailya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Victoria M. Calvert for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:25-cv-854-VMC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/27/2025. (dob)
February 25, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion of Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Policy)(Scott, Gailya)
February 20, 2025 Filing 6 Withdrawal of Motion #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by United States Liability Insurance Company filed by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Scott, Gailya)
February 20, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Cover Sheet by United States Liability Insurance Company (Scott, Gailya)
February 20, 2025 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Eric A. Fitzgerald. Clerk to follow-up by 3/3/2025. (mh)
February 18, 2025 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States Liability Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for United States Liability Insurance Company. (dgr)
February 18, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(dgr) Modified on 2/20/2025 - filed in error; to be withdrawn by attorney (jbu).
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-14073430) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Return of Service, #3 Notice of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goggins et al v. Gonzalez-Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericka Goggins
Represented By: Monica A. Teasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luchion Goggins
Represented By: Monica A. Teasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoel Gonzalez-Martinez
Represented By: Michael L. Miller
Represented By: Katherine Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YKL Transport, LLC.
Represented By: Michael L. Miller
Represented By: Katherine Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: Gailya McElroy Scott
Represented By: Eric A. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooklyn Specialty Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Miller
Represented By: Katherine Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?