Northrup v. Bierenbaum et al
Plaintiff: Janet S. Northrup
Defendant: Barry Bierenbaum, Gail Bierenbaum, Taylor Mercantile, LLC, Mongo Holdings, LLC, Mongo Holdings BG Investments, LLC and 504N Ventures, LLC
Case Number: 1:2025cv00943
Filed: February 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Geraghty
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 3304 Transfer fraudulent as to a debt to United States
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2025 Filing 16 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 4/9/25, 4/10/25, 4/11/25, 8/20/25, 8/21/25, 8/22/25, 9/4/25, 9/5/25, 9/6/25, 9/7/25, 9/8/25, 9/9/25, 9/10/25, 9/11/25, 9/12/25, 9/13/25, 9/14/25, 9/15/25, 9/16/25, 9/17/25, 9/18/25, 9/19/25, by Steven Rosenwasser. (Rosenwasser, Steven)
March 27, 2025 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janet S. Northrup. (Rosenwasser, Steven)
March 20, 2025 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Janet S. Northrup. Gail Bierenbaum waiver mailed on 3/4/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Rosenwasser, Steven)
March 20, 2025 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Janet S. Northrup. Barry Bierenbaum waiver mailed on 3/4/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Rosenwasser, Steven)
March 10, 2025 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Janet S. Northrup. 504N Ventures, LLC waiver mailed on 3/4/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Rosenwasser, Steven)
March 10, 2025 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Janet S. Northrup. Mongo Holdings BG Investments, LLC waiver mailed on 3/4/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Rosenwasser, Steven)
March 10, 2025 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Janet S. Northrup. Mongo Holdings, LLC waiver mailed on 3/4/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Rosenwasser, Steven)
March 10, 2025 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Janet S. Northrup. Taylor Mercantile, LLC waiver mailed on 3/4/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Rosenwasser, Steven)
February 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 2/28/2025. (sap)
February 24, 2025 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Taylor Mercantile, LLC. (jbu)
February 24, 2025 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mongo Holdings, LLC. (jbu)
February 24, 2025 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mongo Holdings BG Investments, LLC. (jbu)
February 24, 2025 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Gail Bierenbaum. (jbu)
February 24, 2025 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Barry Bierenbaum. (jbu)
February 24, 2025 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to 504N Ventures, LLC. (jbu)
February 24, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Janet S. Northrup. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14091991) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2018 Distributions, #2 Exhibit B - 2019 Distributions, #3 Exhibit C - 2020 Distributions, #4 Exhibit D - Taylor Transfers, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(jbu) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northrup v. Bierenbaum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet S. Northrup
Represented By: William Evan Eye
Represented By: Steven Rosenwasser
Represented By: John D. Elrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Bierenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Bierenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Mercantile, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mongo Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mongo Holdings BG Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 504N Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?