Prime v. Manhattan Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Prime
Defendant: Manhattan Associates, Inc., Eddie Capel and Dennis B. Story
Case Number: 1:2025cv00992
Filed: February 25, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Tiffany R Johnson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2025 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eddie Capel, Manhattan Associates, Inc., Dennis B. Story. (Pope, B.)
April 25, 2025 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases with Brief In Support by Eddie Capel, Manhattan Associates, Inc., Dennis B. Story. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pope, B.)
April 25, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Marie Rezek on behalf of Eddie Capel, Manhattan Associates, Inc., Dennis B. Story (Rezek, Bethany)
April 25, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by B. Warren Pope on behalf of Eddie Capel, Manhattan Associates, Inc., Dennis B. Story (Pope, B.)
April 22, 2025 Refund in the amount of $100.00 has been processed, effective 4/22/2025 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
April 21, 2025 Opinion or Order ORDER by docket entry only approving #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vicefor Adam Marc Apton. Approved by Judge Tiffany R Johnson on 4/21/25. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bmr)
April 21, 2025 Clerks Approval re #9 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-14130343. (mec)
April 18, 2025 Filing 9 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-14130343. (Bain, David)
April 18, 2025 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Adam Marc Apton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14233910).by Timothy Prime. (Bain, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 18, 2025 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Adam Marc Apton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14233910). Attorney Adam M. Apton added appearing on behalf of Timothy Prime. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr)
April 17, 2025 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Timothy Prime. Eddie Capel waiver mailed on 4/17/2025, answer due 6/16/2025. (Bain, David)
April 17, 2025 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Timothy Prime. Dennis B. Story waiver mailed on 4/17/2025, answer due 6/16/2025. (Bain, David)
April 17, 2025 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Timothy Prime. Manhattan Associates, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/17/2025, answer due 6/16/2025. (Bain, David)
April 17, 2025 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Timothy Prime. (Bain, David)
April 17, 2025 RETURN of #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Adam Marc Apton Pro Hac Vice to attorney for correction. Reason for return: The application fee must be paid. (mh)
April 16, 2025 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Adam Marc Apton Pro Hac Vice.by Timothy Prime. (Bain, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 26, 2025 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Adam M. Apton. Clerk to follow-up by 3/10/2025. (jas)
February 25, 2025 Filing 1 Class Action COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Timothy Prime. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14098377) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Timothy Prime, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime v. Manhattan Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Prime
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Represented By: Adam M. Apton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manhattan Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Capel
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis B. Story
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?