Zayo Group, LLC v. Falcon Directional Drilling, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zayo Group, LLC
Defendant: Falcon Directional Drilling, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2025cv01005
Filed: February 26, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2025 Filing 6 COURT'S NOTICE of Filing Standing Order - INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony J. Jorgenson. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 3/03/2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
March 3, 2025 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony J. Jorgenson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14108782). Attorney Anthony J. Jorgenson added appearing on behalf of Zayo Group, LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (mh)
February 28, 2025 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony J. Jorgenson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14108782). with Brief In Support by Zayo Group, LLC. (Sandifer, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 28, 2025 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Anthony J. Jorgenson. Clerk to follow-up by 3/10/2025. (jas)
February 26, 2025 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Falcon Directional Drilling, Inc. (ane)
February 26, 2025 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zayo Group, LLC. (ane)
February 26, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Zayo Group, LLC. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14101035) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zayo Group, LLC v. Falcon Directional Drilling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zayo Group, LLC
Represented By: John W. Sandifer
Represented By: Anthony J. Jorgenson
Represented By: Anthony J. Jorgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon Directional Drilling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?