Jackson v. State of Georgia et al
Petitioner: Bianca Lea Jackson
Respondent: State of Georgia and Brooks L. Benton
Case Number: 2:2018cv00143
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing by Brooks L. Benton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 a copy of the Georgia Court of Appeals unpublished opinion affirming Petitioners conviction on direct appeal, issued on September 17, 2013., #2 Exhibit Ex 2 a copy of the state habeas corpus petition filed in Pulaski County on September 2, 2014., #3 Exhibit Ex 3 a copy of the state habeas corpus courts final order denying relief on April 5, 2017., #4 Exhibit Ex 4 a copy of the Georgia Supreme Courts order denying Petitioners application for a certificate of probable cause to appeal on June 18, 2018., #5 Exhibit Ex 5 a copy of the remittitur from the Georgia Supreme Court issued on July 16, 2018.)(Rea, Jason)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss petition as untimely with Brief In Support by Brooks L. Benton. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of motion to dismiss petition as untimely)(Rea, Jason)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER- RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Brooks L. Benton.(Rea, Jason) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Brooks L. Benton (Smith, Paula)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Rea on behalf of Brooks L. Benton (Rea, Jason)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 Certified Mail Returned Receipt by Brooks Benton re Clerks Certificate of Mailing of the #1 Petition and #3 Order. (dgr)
September 7, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Certified Mailing as to Brooks L. Benton and Christopher Carr re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #3 Order. Brooks Benton Certified Mail Receipt Number 7008 2810 0001 8476 0534. Christopher Carr Certified Mail Receipt Number 7008 2810 0001 8476 0541. (dgr)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk SHALL transmit a copy of the petition and this Order by certified mail to Respondent Benton and to the Attorney General for the State of Georgia. Respondent shall SHOW CAUSE within 35 days of receipt of this Order why the petition should not be granted and shall transmit to this Court all available documents needed to determine the issues raised, including whether Petitioner has exhausted her state court remedies and whether the petition is timely filed. Respondent may ignore the electronic summons (Doc. 2), which is appropriate under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, not under Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, which provides that if summary dismissal of a habeas petition is not warranted, the court must order the respondent to file a response, motion or other response within a fixed time, in this case 35 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 09/06/2018. (dgr)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brooks L. Benton and State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Summons State of Georgia)(dgr)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Bianca Lea Jackson. (Filing fee $5 receipt number 113E-8105503.) (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. State of Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bianca Lea Jackson
Represented By: J. M. Raffauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brooks L. Benton
Represented By: Jason Matthew Rea
Represented By: Paula K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?