U.S. Bank, N.A., as Legal Title Trustee for Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust II v. Guinn et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Legal Title Trustee for Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust II
Defendant: Cynthia R. Guinn, Ronald Head, Joanne McClure, James Beaver, Jewel Cole, James R. Guinn and Don McClure
Case Number: 2:2018cv00157
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:l332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cynthia R. Guinn amd James R. Guinn re #4 Notice to Pro Se Parties. (dgr)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Parties. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 10/9/2018. (dgr)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Cynthia R. Guinn and James R. Guinn. Discovery ends on 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to James Beaver, Jewel Cole, Cynthia R. Guinn, James R. Guinn, Ronald Head, and Don McClure. (Attachments: #1 Summons Don McClure, #2 Summons James Beaver, #3 Summons James R. Guinn, #4 Summons Jewel Cole, #5 Summons Ronald Head)(dgr)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., as Legal Title Trustee for Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust II. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8126363) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Legal Title Trustee for Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust II v. Guinn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia R. Guinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewel Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Guinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Legal Title Trustee for Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust II
Represented By: Paul Gerard Wersant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?