Accelerated Memory Tech, LLC v. Barracuda Networks, Inc.
Plaintiff: Accelerated Memory Tech, LLC
Defendant: Barracuda Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00175
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Barracuda Networks, Inc. Answer due 12/17/2018. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/13/2018. (dgr)
November 12, 2018 Filing 9 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time through 12/17/18 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Accelerated Memory Tech, LLC. (Hill, Steven) Modified on 11/13/2018 to correct event type (sk).
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Having considered PLAINTIFF'S STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND UP TO AND THROUGH NOVEMBER 16, 2018, re #7 it is hereby ordered that the period in which Defendant may file its answer, motion, or other response to the Complaint is extended through and including November 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/10/2018. (dgr)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND UP TO AND THROUGH NOVEMBER 16, 2018 by Accelerated Memory Tech, LLC. (Hill, Steven)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Accelerated Memory Tech, LLC. Accelerated Memory Tech, LLC served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Hill, Steven)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Barracuda Networks, Inc.. (bnw)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Accelerated Memory Tech, LLC (Hill, Steven)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rsg)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Accelerated Memory Tech, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8165660) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Accelerated Memory Tech, LLC v. Barracuda Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barracuda Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accelerated Memory Tech, LLC
Represented By: Steven G. Hill
Represented By: Vivek Ganti
Represented By: John L. North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?