Moore et al v. Johnston et al

Plaintiff: Sondra Moore and Tony McDaniel
Defendant: Allan Johnston, Thomas Mitchell and The City of Statham
Case Number: 2:2018cv00190
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Cancellation of Hearing #5 scheduled for Friday, November 16. (sk)
November 15, 2018 10 NOTICE by Tony McDaniel, Sondra Moore of withdrawal of Plaintiff's request for hearing on preliminary injunction (Greenamyre, Zack)
November 14, 2018 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Allan Johnston, Thomas Mitchell, The City of Statham. (Lee, Dianna)
November 14, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dianna J. Lee on behalf of Allan Johnston, The City of Statham (Lee, Dianna)
November 14, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Harvey Scott Gray on behalf of Allan Johnston, The City of Statham (Gray, Harvey)
November 13, 2018 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sondra Moore, Tony McDaniel. Allan Johnston waiver mailed on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019; Thomas Mitchell waiver mailed on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019; The City of Statham waiver mailed on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Service - Johnston, #2 Executed Waiver of Service - Mitchell)(Greenamyre, Zack)
October 17, 2018 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2018 at 01:00 PM in GAIN Courtroom 303 before Judge Richard W. Story. (jpa)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
October 15, 2018 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Allan Johnston, Thomas Mitchell, The City of Statham. (Attachments: #1 Summons Mitchell, #2 Summons Statham)(dgr)
October 15, 2018 Submission of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (dgr)
October 15, 2018 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Permanent Injunctive Relief with Brief In Support by Tony McDaniel, Sondra Moore. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(dgr)
October 15, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sondra Moore and Tony McDaniel. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8204968) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit Sondra Moore, #4 Affidavit Tony McDaniel, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Johnston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sondra Moore
Represented By: Gerald R. Weber
Represented By: Zack Greenamyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony McDaniel
Represented By: Gerald R. Weber
Represented By: Zack Greenamyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Johnston
Represented By: Dianna J. Lee
Represented By: Harvey Scott Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mitchell
Represented By: Dianna J. Lee
Represented By: Harvey Scott Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Statham
Represented By: Dianna J. Lee
Represented By: Harvey Scott Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?