Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Old Castle Home Design Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Defendant: Old Castle Home Design Center, LLC and Babak Kohan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00030
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (rsg)
April 9, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #12 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (rsg)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Durdaller, Paul)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Answer to Complaint filed by Babak Kohan, Old Castle Home Design Center, LLC (Geer, Will)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Branch Banking and Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent BB&T Corporation for Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Levy, Brian)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Babak Kohan, Old Castle Home Design Center, LLC. Discovery ends on 8/2/2019.(Geer, Will) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. Old Castle Home Design Center, LLC served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (Levy, Brian)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Order. Consent Order Authorizing Entry and Inspection of the Collateral. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/19/2019. (dgr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Authorizing Entry and Inspection of the Collateral re: #4 Emergency MOTION for Order Authorizing Immediate Entry and Inspection of the Collateral. (Durdaller, Paul)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. Babak Kohan served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Levy, Brian)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Order Authorizing Immediate Entry and Inspection of the Collateral by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Security Agreement, #2 Exhibit UCC Financing Statement, #3 Exhibit Old Castle Home Design SOS Filing, #4 Exhibit Old Castle Design SOS Filing, #5 Exhibit Old Castle Home Design Website, #6 Exhibit Demand for Immediate Inspection, #7 Affidavit Declaration of Tanisha Thomas, #8 Exhibit Email to Babak Kohan, #9 Exhibit Process Service Attempt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Emergency Order Authorizing Immediate Entry and Inspection of the Collateral)(Durdaller, Paul)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Babak Kohan, Old Castle Home Design Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Babak Kohan)(dgr)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8442851) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Old Castle Home Design Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Paul G. Durdaller
Represented By: Brian Joel Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Castle Home Design Center, LLC
Represented By: Will B. Geer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babak Kohan
Represented By: Will B. Geer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?