Moreira et al v. Pointe West Homeowner's Association et al
Plaintiff: Zulema Moreira and Dr. Martin Moreira
Defendant: Ms. Carol Bruce and Pointe West Homeowner's Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv00073
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1982
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Pointe West Homeowner's Association, Carol Bruce. Discovery ends on 11/8/2019.(Kahren, Melissa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/11/2019 to add proper filers (sk).
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zulema Moreira, Martin Moreira. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waivers of Service)(Goodmark, Craig)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Martin Moreira, Zulema Moreira. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8569490) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreira et al v. Pointe West Homeowner's Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zulema Moreira
Represented By: Gerald R. Weber
Represented By: Craig Lewis Goodmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Martin Moreira
Represented By: Gerald R. Weber
Represented By: Craig Lewis Goodmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Carol Bruce
Represented By: Melissa Kaye Kahren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pointe West Homeowner's Association
Represented By: Melissa Kaye Kahren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?