THN, Inc. v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Plaintiff: THN, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00141
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Chaness, Bret)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by THN, Inc.. (Johnson, Burke)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit "A" Bankruptcy Petition, #3 Exhibit "B" Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit "C" Discharge)(Chaness, Bret)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:19-cv-141-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/15/2019. (dgr)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. Answer due 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/11/2019. (dgr)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time)(Chaness, Bret)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8777844) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A with Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THN, Inc. v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Kearstin Harumi Sale
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THN, Inc.
Represented By: Burke Blackwell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?