Versa-Gard, LLC v. PMG Ventures, Inc.
Plaintiff: Versa-Gard, LLC
Defendant: PMG Ventures, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00148
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by PMG Ventures, Inc.. (Trimble, Seth)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 6/2/2020.), COUNTERCLAIM against Versa-Gard, LLC with Jury Demand by PMG Ventures, Inc..(Trimble, Seth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, PMG Ventures, Inc. Answer due 9/6/2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 08/05/2019. (rsg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Coby Nixon on behalf of PMG Ventures, Inc. (Nixon, Coby)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Edward Jones on behalf of PMG Ventures, Inc. (Jones, Todd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PMG Ventures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Trimble, Seth)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Versa-Gard, LLC. PMG Ventures, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Risley, Stephen)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to PMG Ventures, Inc.. (rsg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Versa-Gard, LLC. (rsg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rsg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Versa-Gard, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8793419) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8,308,294, #2 Exhibit B - Prosecution History for U.S. Patent No. 8,308,294, #3 Exhibit C - Claim Charts, #4 Exhibit D - Notice Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Versa-Gard, LLC v. PMG Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Versa-Gard, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Represented By: Stephen Robert Risley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMG Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Edward Jones
Represented By: Coby Nixon
Represented By: Seth Kincaid Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?