Harris v. Kipper Tool Company
Plaintiff: James "Al" Harris
Defendant: Kipper Tool Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00159
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Kipper Tool Company.(Hughes, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Kipper Tool Company.(Hughes, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 Initial Disclosures by Kipper Tool Company.(Hughes, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant by James "Al" Harris.(Attwood, Eleanor)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant by James "Al" Harris.(Attwood, Eleanor)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 3/13/2020. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 9/13/2019. (dgr)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 9/13/2019. (dgr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Kipper Tool Company. (Hughes, David)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures by James "Al" Harris.(Attwood, Eleanor)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kipper Tool Company by Kipper Tool Company.(Hughes, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by James "Al" Harris. (Attwood, Eleanor)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Claire Smith on behalf of Kipper Tool Company (Smith, Mary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Kipper Tool Company. Discovery ends on 1/13/2020.(Hughes, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by James "Al" Harris. Kipper Tool Company served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Attwood, Eleanor)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kipper Tool Company. (dgr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by James "Al" Harris. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8815221) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Kipper Tool Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kipper Tool Company
Represented By: David Andrew Hughes
Represented By: Mary Claire Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James "Al" Harris
Represented By: Eleanor Mixon Attwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?