Zavala et al v. U.S. Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz and Thania Zavala
Defendant: U.S. Consulate General in Ciudad Juarez, Michael R. Pompeo, John Tavenner, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, William Barr, Christopher A. Wray, John Does and Federal Bureau of Investigations
Case Number: 2:2019cv00162
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 20 Return of Service Executed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala. All Defendants. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Thania Zavala. All Defendants. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Thania Zavala. U.S. Consulate General in Ciudad Juarez served on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Holden, Giovanna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Thania Zavala. U.S. Department of State served on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Holden, Giovanna)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Michael R. Pompeo, John Tavenner, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Consulate General in Ciudad Juarez, U.S. Department of State, Christopher A. Wray. Summons as to John Does not issued. Summons as to Kevin McAleenan and U.S. Secretary of Homeland Security not issued for insufficient addresses. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Department of State, #2 Summons US Consulate, #3 Summons US Citizenship and Immigration Services, #4 Summons Michael Pompeo, #5 Summons Kenneth Cuccinelli, #6 Summons FBI, #7 Summons Consul General, #8 Summons Christopher Wray, #9 Summons US Attorney General)(dgr)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala (Holden, Giovanna) Modified on 8/1/2019 to edit docket text (dgr).
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz, Thania Zavala (Holden, Giovanna)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz and Thania Zavala. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8822783) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zavala et al v. U.S. Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Consulate General in Ciudad Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tavenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Arechiga Cruz
Represented By: Giovanna Andrea Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thania Zavala
Represented By: Giovanna Andrea Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?