Calatlantic Group, Inc. v. Reid's Barn, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Calatlantic Group, Inc.
Defendant: Reid's Barn, LLC and Wanda S. Reid
Case Number: 2:2019cv00199
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Calatlantic Group, Inc.. Wanda S. Reid waiver mailed on 9/20/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Covington, Troy)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Calatlantic Group, Inc.. Reid's Barn, LLC waiver mailed on 9/20/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Covington, Troy)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:19-cv-00199-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/11/2019. (rsg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Calatlantic Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lennar Corporation for Calatlantic Group, Inc.. (Covington, Troy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wanda S. Reid and Reid's Barn, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Wanda Reid)(dgr)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Calatlantic Group, Inc. as to Reid's Barn, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Wanda S. Reid)(Covington, Troy)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Calatlantic Group, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8913972) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calatlantic Group, Inc. v. Reid's Barn, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reid's Barn, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda S. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calatlantic Group, Inc.
Represented By: Simon Howard Bloom
Represented By: Troy R. Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?