Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. v. Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv00210
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.. Internal Revenue Service served on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney for N.D. Georgia, Civil Process Clerk)(Berry, Brannon)
November 7, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Internal Revenue Service. Discovery ends on 4/6/2020.(Carter, Kieran) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 24, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kieran O. Carter on behalf of Internal Revenue Service (Carter, Kieran)
October 24, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service filed by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc..(Berry, Brannon) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 23, 2019 Filing 21 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Internal Revenue. (dgr)
October 22, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. to Commissioner of IRS (Berry, Brannon)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Brannon Lee Berry Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/22/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dgr)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Jason Kirk Elam Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/22/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dgr)
October 22, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Kirk Elam and Brannon Lee Berry re #18 Order on Application for Admission PHV and #19 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (dgr)
October 22, 2019 RETURN of #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Kieran O'Neill Carter Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. To attorney for correction re: Courts (cdg)
October 21, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason Elam Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Jason Kirk Elam added appearing on behalf of Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. (cdg)
October 21, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Brannon Berry Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. Attorney Brannon Lee Berry added appearing on behalf of Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. (cdg)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Kieran O'Neill Carter Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by United States Department of the Treasury. (Treadwell, Trishanda)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Brannon Berry Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brannon Berry Certificate of Good Standing)(Williams, Amy)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason Elam Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jason Elam Certificate of Good standing)(Williams, Amy)
October 10, 2019 RETURN of #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason K. Elam Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb)
October 10, 2019 RETURN of #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Brannon L. Berry Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Brannon L. Berry Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Williams, Amy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason K. Elam Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Williams, Amy)
October 2, 2019 RETURN of #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Brannon Berry Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction. re: Local counsel (cdg)
October 2, 2019 RETURN of #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason K. Elam Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: Local counsel (cdg)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Brannon Berry Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Williams, Amy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason K. Elam Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Williams, Amy)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
September 23, 2019 RETURN of #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason K. Elam Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8940529). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb)
September 23, 2019 RETURN of #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Brannon Berry Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8940652). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb)
September 20, 2019 Clerks Approval re #9 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
September 20, 2019 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 09/20/2019 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-8934350. (Williams, Amy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Department of the Treasury. (Attachments: #1 Summons Civil Process Clerk, #2 Summons Attorney General)(dgr)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. to U.S. Attorney General Office DC (Williams, Amy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. to U.S. Attorney's Office Northern District of Georgia (Williams, Amy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. to Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service (Williams, Amy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Brannon Berry Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8940652). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.. (Williams, Amy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason K. Elam Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8940529). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Williams, Amy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.. (Williams, Amy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8936118) (Attachments: #1 Blank Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #3 Exhibit A) (dgr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.
Represented By: Amy V Williams
Represented By: Jason Kirk Elam
Represented By: Brannon Lee Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Trishanda L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Kieran O. Carter
Represented By: Trishanda L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?