Champlin v. Enchanted Mountain Retreats, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eric Champlin
Defendant: Enchanted Mountain Retreats, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00290
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (dgr)
February 7, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (dgr)
February 7, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (dgr)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Eric Champlin (Rothman, Joel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Eric Champlin. Enchanted Mountain Retreats, Inc. served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. (Rothman, Joel)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (dgr)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Rothman, Joel)
December 19, 2019 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (rsg)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Enchanted Mountain Retreats, Inc.. (rsg)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Eric Champlin. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9190946) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champlin v. Enchanted Mountain Retreats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Champlin
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enchanted Mountain Retreats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?