Ensley v. Jackson County School System Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: David Ensley
Defendant: Jackson County School System Board of Education, Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc. and Bowen & Watson, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00043
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time re #18 MOTION for More Definite Statement and Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. The time in which Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion is hereby extended up and through April 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 04/06/2020. (rsg)
April 6, 2020 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: #18 MOTION for More Definite Statement and Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's ComplaintMOTION to Dismiss, #24 Proposed Consent Order with Brief In Support by David Ensley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)(Jones, Kwende)
April 3, 2020 Filing 24 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER [Proposed] Consent Order re: #18 MOTION for More Definite Statement and Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's ComplaintMOTION to Dismiss. (Jones, Kwende)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Stay. The above-captioned matter is stayed until this Court rules on the pending Motion for More Definite Statement and Partial Motion to Dismiss #18 . The Parties shall have until and through twenty-one (21) days after Defendant Jackson County School District files its Answer within which to conduct the N.D. Ga. LR 16.1 planning conference. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/30/2020. (dgr)
March 30, 2020 Filing 21 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 9, 10; May 29; July 21, 22, 23, 24, 27; September 4, 21, 22, 23; November 25; December 22, 23, 24, 28, 29, 30, 31, 2020, by Myrece Rebecca Johnson. (Johnson, Myrece)
March 30, 2020 Filing 20 ---Duplicate Filing See DE#21 --- Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 9, 10; May 29; July 21, 23, 24, 27; September 4, 21, 22, 23; November 25; December 22, 23, 24, 28, 29, 30, 31, 2020, by Myrece Rebecca Johnson. (Johnson, Myrece) Modified on 3/31/2020 (rsg).
March 30, 2020 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery with Brief In Support by Jackson County School System Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Paul, Aparesh)
March 24, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for More Definite Statement and Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Jackson County School System Board of Education. (Paul, Aparesh) . Added Partial MOTION to Dismiss on 3/24/2020 (sk).
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/16/2020. (rsg)
March 17, 2020 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc.. (Marsh, C.)
March 17, 2020 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bowen & Watson, Inc.. (Marsh, C.)
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons by Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc.. (Marsh, C.)
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bowen & Watson, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Watson Brothers Holdings, Inc. for Bowen & Watson, Inc.. (Marsh, C.)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc..(Marsh, C.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Bowen & Watson, Inc.. Discovery ends on 8/14/2020.(Marsh, C.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by David Ensley. Jackson County School System Board of Education served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Jones, Kwende)
March 3, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by David Ensley. Bowen & Watson, Inc. served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (dgr)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by David Ensley. Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (dgr)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing Proofs of Service by David Ensley re #1 Complaint, #2 Electronic Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Service on Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc., #2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Service on Bowen & Watson, Inc.)(Jones, Kwende) Modified on 3/3/2020 to correctly file return of service executed doc's #7 and #8 (dgr).
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jackson County School System Board of Education. (dgr)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by David Ensley to Jackson County School System Board of Education (Jones, Kwende)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Bowen & Watson, Inc., Jackson County School System Board of Education, Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bowen & Watson, #2 Summons Jackson BOE)(rsg)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by David Ensley. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9397076) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ensley v. Jackson County School System Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County School System Board of Education
Represented By: Aparesh Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simpson Trucking & Grading, Inc.
Represented By: Myrece Rebecca Johnson
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Represented By: Sara Alexandre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowen & Watson, Inc.
Represented By: Myrece Rebecca Johnson
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Represented By: Sara Alexandre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ensley
Represented By: Elizabeth Bolton Davis
Represented By: Kwende B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?