Gibson v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Bobby Glenn Gibson, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv00109
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (adg) (ADI)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Bobby Glenn Gibson, Jr. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 5/11/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proof of Service The US Attorneys Office, #2 Summons Proof of Service The Attorney General)(Brown, Trevor)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons - US Attorney, #2 Summons - US Attorney General)(rsg)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Bobby Glenn Gibson, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is hereby GRANTED and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Complaint as of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff is to perform service of process in accordance with FED. R. CIV. P. 4(i). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 05/07/2020. (rsg)
May 5, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (dgr)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 SECOND AMENDMENT IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/2020. (dgr)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bobby Glenn Gibson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 Proposed Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons Commissioner, #4 Proposed Summons US Attorney, #5 Proposed Summons Attorney General, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(dgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Glenn Gibson, Jr.
Represented By: Trevor Alan Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?