Harriott v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Christine Harriott
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv00165
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 ---Filed in Incorrect Case---Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons - US Attorney, #2 Summons - US Attorney General)(rsg) Modified on 9/1/2020 (rsg).
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Christine Harriott. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 8/24/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. (Olinsky, Howard)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons - US Attorney, #2 Summons - US Attorney General)(rsg)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed by Christine Harriott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Complaint as of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff is to perform service of process in accordance with FED. R. CIV. P. 4(i). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 07/20/2020. (rsg)
July 16, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (dgr)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Christine Harriott. (dgr)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 FIFTH AMENDMENT IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (dgr)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christine Harriott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Council, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Commissioner, #5 Proposed Summons Attorney General, #6 Proposed Summons US Attorney)(dgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harriott v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Harriott
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?