Russell v. Piedmont Healthcare, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kelly L. Russell
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC, Piedmont Healthcare, Inc. and Piedmont Mountainside Hospital, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00185
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 24, 2020 Filing 26 First MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Kelly L. Russell. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Remand)(Gibson, Douglas)
September 23, 2020 Submission of #9 First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
September 15, 2020 Submission of #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
September 11, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY in Support of #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cook Medical, LLC. (Lewis, E. Righton) Modified text on 9/11/2020 (rsg).
September 10, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Cook Medical, LLC Joinder in Piedmont Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Lewis, E. Righton)
September 8, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Kelly L. Russell (Gibson, Douglas)
September 8, 2020 Submission of the #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (aaq)
September 4, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Piedmont Healthcare, Inc., Piedmont Mountainside Hospital, Inc.. (Benton, Terrell)
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 First MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file First Amended Complaint filed by Piedmont Healthcare, Inc., Piedmont Mountainside Hospital, Inc.. (Benton, Terrell)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kelly L. Russell. (Gibson, Douglas)
August 26, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Kelly L. Russell re #17 Letter re:83.1 Response to letter from Clerk (Gibson, Douglas)
August 26, 2020 Filing 17 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Douglas L. Gibson. Clerk to follow-up by 9/8/2020. (nmb)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #13 Motion for Relief; granting #14 Motion to Stay; granting #15 Motion to Stay. Discovery is stayed pending the Court's ruling on the outstanding motions to dismiss. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 8/25/2020. (pdw)
August 24, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant Cook Medical, LLCs Response to Plaintiffs First Requests to Admit to All Defendants by Cook Medical, LLC.(Lawrence, Pamela)
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Discovery Deadlines Pending Motion to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Cook Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Lewis, E. Righton)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Discovery with Brief In Support by Piedmont Healthcare, Inc., Piedmont Mountainside Hospital, Inc.. (Benton, Terrell)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Relief from Answering Pre-Removal Discovery and Memorandum of Law In Support with Brief In Support by Piedmont Healthcare, Inc., Piedmont Mountainside Hospital, Inc.. (Benton, Terrell)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by Piedmont Healthcare, Inc., Piedmont Mountainside Hospital, Inc.. (Benton, Terrell)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kelly L. Russell. (Gibson, Douglas)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 First Certificate of Interested Persons by Kelly L. Russell. (Gibson, Douglas)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Kelly L. Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Gibson, Douglas)
August 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to as to Douglas Gibson, attorney for Kelly L. Russell re #8 Order Reassigning Case. (dgr)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:20-cv-185-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/17/2020. (dgr)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions by Piedmont Healthcare, Inc., Piedmont Mountainside Hospital, Inc..(Benton, Terrell)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Cook Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Lewis, E. Righton)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cook Medical, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cook Medical Holdings, LLC for Cook Medical, LLC by Cook Medical, LLC.(Lewis, E. Righton)
August 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Douglas Gibson, attorney for Kelly L. Russell re #4 General Order. (rsg)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (rsg)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Piedmont Healthcare, Inc., Piedmont Mountainside Hospital, Inc.. (Filed in State Court 7/30/20) (rsg)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Piedmont Healthcare, Inc., Piedmont Mountainside Hospital, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/4/2021. (Filed in State Court 7/30/20)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Cook Medical, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10004611) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified filer on 8/10/2020 (rsg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Piedmont Healthcare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly L. Russell
Represented By: Douglas Gibson
Represented By: Douglas L. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Represented By: E. Righton Johnson Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piedmont Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Lawson Coia
Represented By: Terrell W. Benton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piedmont Mountainside Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Lawson Coia
Represented By: Terrell W. Benton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?