Wheeler v. The United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Wheeler
Defendant: Gail Rentschler, Duncan Akana and The United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00189
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons by Jeffrey Wheeler. (Patel, Amit)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Initial Disclosures by Jeffrey Wheeler.(Patel, Amit)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 First JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Jeffrey Wheeler. (Patel, Amit)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 First Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gail Rentschler. (Kim, John) Modified on 9/21/2020 (rjs).
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Gail Rentschler. Discovery ends on 2/8/2021.(Kim, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 9/10/2020 (rjs).
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:20-cv-189-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/24/2020. (dgr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Duncan Akana, Gail Rentschler, The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons Gail Rentschler, #2 Summons The United States of America)(dgr)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 SIXTH AMENDMENT IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/2020. (dgr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jeffrey Wheeler. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10039371) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Rentschler
Represented By: John H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan Akana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Wheeler
Represented By: Aaron L Michelman
Represented By: Amit Kavsik Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?