LeafFilter North, LLC v. Home Craft Builders, Inc.
Plaintiff: Leaffilter North, LLC
Defendant: Home Craft Builders, Inc. doing business as HomeCraft Gutter Protection
Case Number: 2:2020cv00220
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (dgr)
October 23, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #21 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (dgr)
October 22, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Leaffilter North, LLC. (Parsons, Megan)
October 19, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Home Craft Builders, Inc.. Discovery ends on 3/18/2021.(Strelzik, Steven) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 9, 2020 RETURN of #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael S. Weinstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10234567). to attorney for correction regarding residential address. (nmb)
October 9, 2020 RETURN of #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark E. Avsec Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10234539). to attorney for correction regarding residential address. (nmb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Steven J Strelzik replacing attorney Arthur M. Kaufman. (Strelzik, Steven)
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael S. Weinstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10234567). with Brief In Support by Leaffilter North, LLC. (Parsons, Megan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark E. Avsec Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10234539). with Brief In Support by Leaffilter North, LLC. (Parsons, Megan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan J. Parsons on behalf of Leaffilter North, LLC (Parsons, Megan)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Michael S. Weinstein. Clerk to follow-up by 10/8/2020. (nmb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Mark E. Avsec. Clerk to follow-up by 10/8/2020. (nmb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Arthur M. Kaufman. Clerk to follow-up by 10/8/2020. (nmb)
September 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Home Craft Builders, Inc., Leaffilter North, LLC re #11 General Order. (rsg)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (rsg)
September 21, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Home Craft Builders, Inc., Leaffilter North, LLC re #10 Court Notice of Filing of Standing Order, #8 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Transfer Case. (sk)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 5:20-cv-01442. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order For the reasons set forth herein, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (ECF No. #4 ) is granted to the extent that it seeks transfer. The Court hereby directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/16/2020. Related document(s) #5 , #7 . (JLG) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/18/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 Reply in support of #4 Motion to dismiss or Transfer filed by Home Craft Builders, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Aaron Culbertson, #2 Exhibit Second Declaration of Aaron Culbertson)(Kaufman, Arthur) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/18/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #6 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/8/2020 to file its reply brief in support of its Motion to Dismiss or Transfer. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/1/2020.(S,Ke) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/18/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for extension of time until September 8, 2020 to file its reply brief in support of its Motion to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Defendant Home Craft Builders, Inc.. (Kaufman, Arthur) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/18/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Opposition to #4 Motion to dismiss or Transfer filed by LeafFilter North, LLC. (Avsec, Mark) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/18/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to dismiss or Transfer filed by Defendant Home Craft Builders, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Culbertson Declaration)(Kaufman, Arthur) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/18/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Home Craft Builders, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/18/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/18/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (M,TL) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/18/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Leaffilter North, LLC. (Avsec, Mark) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/18/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Home Craft Builders, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10077312.. Filed by Leaffilter North, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Avsec, Mark) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeafFilter North, LLC v. Home Craft Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leaffilter North, LLC
Represented By: Mark E. Avsec
Represented By: Michael S. Weinstein
Represented By: Megan J. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Craft Builders, Inc. doing business as HomeCraft Gutter Protection
Represented By: Arthur M. Kaufman
Represented By: Steven J Strelzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?