Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC v. 137 Acres, LLC
Plaintiff: Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC
Defendant: 137 Acres, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00221
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 16 Initial Disclosures by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC.(Bessho, David)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER approving the #14 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 7/19/2021. (8-Month Discovery Plan) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/02/2020. (rsg)
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by 137 Acres, LLC. (Davis, William)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by 137 Acres, LLC. Discovery ends on 3/19/2021.(Davis, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. 137 Acres, LLC served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Bessho, David)
October 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael R. Marx re #11 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (dgr)
October 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Paul B. Hines re #10 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (dgr)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Michael R. Marx Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/5/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dgr)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Paul B. Hines Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/5/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dgr)
October 5, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael R. Marx Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10207896).. Attorney Michael R. Marx added appearing on behalf of Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC (nmb)
October 5, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul B. Hines Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10207860).. Attorney Paul B. Hines added appearing on behalf of Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC (nmb)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael R. Marx Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10207896).by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Bessho, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul B. Hines Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10207860).by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Bessho, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC identifying Other Affiliate OSI Restaurant Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate OSI HoldCo, Inc. for Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Bessho, David)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
September 28, 2020 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 9/28/2020 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
September 28, 2020 Clerks Approval re #4 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-10167030. (Bessho, David)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/01/2020. (rsg)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to 137 Acres, LLC. (rsg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10170081) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC v. 137 Acres, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC
Represented By: David M. Bessho
Represented By: Michael R. Marx
Represented By: Paul B. Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 137 Acres, LLC
Represented By: Kim M. Jackson
Represented By: William Matthew Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?