Ruis v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Truman R. Ruis
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv00280
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (dgs) (ADI)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
December 8, 2020 CLERK'S Notification of Reassignment to US Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Standing Order 07-02 re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:20-cv-280-JCF. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (dgr)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Civil Process Clerk, #2 Summons Attorney General)(dgr)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Truman R. Ruis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AC Denial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Complaint as of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff is to perform service of process in accordance with FED. R. CIV. P. 4(i). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 12/7/2020. (dgr)
December 7, 2020 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Truman R. Ruis. (Gowen, Deborah)
December 4, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (dgr)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 EIGHTH AMENDMENT IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (dgr)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Truman R. Ruis. (Attachments: #1 IFP App, #2 Proposed Complaint, #3 Exhibit AC Denial, #4 Proposed Summons Commissioner, #5 Proposed Summons Civil Process Clerk, #6 Proposed Summons Attorney General, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(dgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruis v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truman R. Ruis
Represented By: Deborah Gowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?