Reese v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Cynthia Reese
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00142
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Cynthia Reese. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 7/12/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. (Mason, Harris)
July 2, 2021 CLERK'S Notification of Reassignment to US Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Standing Order 07-02 re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:21-cv-142-JCF. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (ddm)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ddm)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Cynthia Reese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - AC Denial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Counsel for Plaintiff is to perform service of process in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 6/30/2021. (ddm)
June 30, 2021 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Cynthia Reese. (Mason, Harris)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cynthia Reese. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Complaint, #4 Exhibit AC Denial, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Attorney General, #7 Summons Civil Process Clerk, #8 Summons Commissioner)(ddm)
June 29, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (ddm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Reese
Represented By: Harris Ray Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?