Faulk v. Walgreen Co. et al
Plaintiff: Marrissa Faulk
Defendant: Walgreen Co., SRS Real Estate Partners, LLC, John P. Adams Properties, Inc., ADT Commercial, LLC and John Doe(s) #1 - #10
Case Number: 2:2021cv00149
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S AMENDED JUDGMENT entered dismissing action without prejudice. (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action without prejudice. (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/21/2021. (ddm)
July 21, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #6 Order to Show Cause, filed by Marrissa Faulk. (Hagen, Bruce)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for plaintiff why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction no later than 5:00 PM on July 30, 2021. Any response Plaintiff files must properly allege the citizenships of all parties: Plaintiff Marrissa Faulk and Defendants Walgreen Co.; SRS Real Estate Partners LLC; John P. Adams Properties/ Inc.; ADT Commercial, LLC; and John Doe(s) #1-10. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 07/15/2021. (rsg)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:21-cv-00149-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 07/12/2021. (rsg)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to show cause within 14 days that this case meets the requirements for diversity of citizenship under 1332. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/12/2021. (ddm)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to ADT Commercial, LLC, John P. Adams Properties, Inc., SRS Real Estate Partners, LLC, Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ddm)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Marrissa Faulk. (ddm)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Marrissa Faulk. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11087467) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faulk v. Walgreen Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marrissa Faulk
Represented By: Bruce A. Hagen
Represented By: Zachary Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRS Real Estate Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Adams Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT Commercial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s) #1 - #10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?