Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. et al v. Frick et al
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. and TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Defendant: Ray Frick and James Frick
Case Number: 2:2021cv00154
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ray Frick. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Manoll, Roy)
August 31, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Leave of Absence of Keisha O. Coleman for the dates of September 22, 2021 through October 1, 2021. (Coleman, Keisha) Modified on 8/31/2021 to edit docket entry (ddm).
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, James Frick and Ray Frick Answers due 9/7/2021. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 08/24/2021. (rsg)
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc..(Coleman, Keisha)
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons by James Frick. (Furlong, Walter)
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by James Frick, Ray Frick. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Furlong, Walter) Modified on 8/17/2021 to edit filers (ddm).
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by TD Ameritrade, Inc., Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. Ray Frick served on 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment of Service (Ray Frick))(Allen, Meredith)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by TD Ameritrade, Inc., Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. James Frick served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Allen, Meredith)
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Reissued as to James Frick. (ddm)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. of James Frick (Coleman, Keisha)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to James Frick, Ray Frick. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ddm)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. of James Frick (Coleman, Keisha)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. of Ray Frick (Coleman, Keisha)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
July 9, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard W. Story. (ddm)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader filed by TD Ameritrade, Inc., Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11095636) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 7/12/2021 to edit docket text (ddm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. et al v. Frick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Keisha Oldacre Coleman
Represented By: Meredith Laughlin Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Represented By: Keisha Oldacre Coleman
Represented By: Meredith Laughlin Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Frick
Represented By: Roy Edward Manoll, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Frick
Represented By: James Michael Bishop
Represented By: Walter W. Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?