Turner v. Gemini Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Travis Turner
Defendant: Vela Insurance Services, LLC and Gemini Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00166
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to Gemini Insurance Company. (ddm)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Travis Turner to Gemini Insurance Company (Hughes, Lindsey)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gemini Insurance Companywith Jury Demand filed by Travis Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A -- Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit Ex. B -- Reservation of Rights Letter, #3 Exhibit Ex. C -- Emails)(Marmins, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to file his First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/8/2021. (ddm)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff Travis Turner's Consent Motion for Leave to File A First Amended Complaint to Substitute Parties by Travis Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Proposed Amended Complaint)(Marmins, David)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Travis Turner. Vela Insurance Services, LLC served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Hughes, Lindsey)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Electronically Reissued as to Vela Insurance Services, LLC. (ddm)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Travis Turner (Hughes, Lindsey)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Travis Turner. Vela Insurance Services, LLC served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Hughes, Lindsey)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Vela Insurance Services, LLC. (ddm)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Travis Turner. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11152730) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declarations Page, #2 Exhibit B - Reservation of Rights Letter, #3 Exhibit C - 2021.05.25 Email, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Gemini Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Turner
Represented By: David Joel Marmins
Represented By: Lindsey E. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vela Insurance Services, LLC
Represented By: Charles M. McDaniel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?