Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company v. Henderson et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Candice Henderson and Henry Henderson, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00170
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. Henry Henderson, Jr waiver mailed on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Meeks, Christopher)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. Candice Henderson waiver mailed on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Meeks, Christopher)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Candice Henderson, Henry Henderson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ddm)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company to Henry Henderson Jr. (Meeks, Christopher)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company to Candice Henderson (Meeks, Christopher)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11156443) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F (mislabeled as E), #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company v. Henderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Cody Meeks
Represented By: Seth M. Friedman
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Munian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Henderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?