Bruce v. O.K. Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Terrell Bruce
Defendant: O.K. Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00245
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting the parties' #6 Consent Motion To Suspend Certain Local Rule Requirements Pending Disposition Of Defendant's Motion To Dismiss. Proceedings and deadlines in this case are STAYED until after the Court rules on Defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 1/11/2022. (ddm)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Suspend Certain Local Rule Requirements Pending Disposition of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss with Brief In Support by O.K. Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crochet, Gregory)
December 22, 2021 Submission of #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (clk)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Terrell Bruce. (Roberts, Victor)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by O.K. Foods, Inc..(Crochet, Gregory)
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Brief In Support by O.K. Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendant's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Defendant's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Crochet, Gregory)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to O.K. Foods, Inc.. (rsg)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Terrell Bruce. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11404900) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce v. O.K. Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Bruce
Represented By: Victor Severin Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.K. Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory R. Crochet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?