Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC v. Hit Box LLC
Plaintiff: Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC
Defendant: Hit Box LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00262
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant by Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC.(North, John)
March 16, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC. (North, John)
March 15, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2022 at 10:00 AM in GAINESVILLE Courtroom 303 before Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
March 11, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE per N.D. Ga. L.R. 26.3 - Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Hit Box LLC.(Maxim, Kevin)
March 11, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC.(North, John)
March 11, 2022 Filing 20 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC. (North, John)
March 10, 2022 Submission of #9 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ON THE PLEADINGS, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
March 9, 2022 Filing 19 REPLY in Support re #9 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ON THE PLEADINGS filed by Hit Box LLC, Hit Box LLC. (Maxim, Kevin) Modified on 3/10/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER approving #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Zachary L. Pelton. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 03/02/2022. (sk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2022: #1 Corrected PDF) (sk).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER approving #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Viceof Franklin M. Smith. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 03/02/2022. (sk)
March 2, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary L. Pelton Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Zachary L. Pelton added appearing on behalf of Hit Box LLC, (cdg)
March 2, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Franklin M. Smith Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Franklin M. Smith added appearing on behalf of Hit Box LLC, (cdg)
March 2, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Franklin M. Smith forHit Box LLC re #17 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (sk)
March 2, 2022 Notification of Docket Correction re #18 Order on Application for Admission PHV of Zachary Pelton. (sk)
March 2, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Zachary L. Pelton for Hit Box LLC re #18 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (sk)
February 25, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary L. Pelton Pro Hac Vice.by Hit Box LLC, Hit Box LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maxim, Kevin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 25, 2022 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Franklin M. Smith Pro Hac Vice.by Hit Box LLC, Hit Box LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maxim, Kevin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 25, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Allen Maxim on behalf of Hit Box LLC (Maxim, Kevin)
February 23, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ON THE PLEADINGS filed by Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC, Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - O.C.G.A. Statutes)(North, John)
February 23, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #8 Counterclaim by Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joytricks Article from Creative Computing, #2 Exhibit B - Superman Gamepad from 2009, #3 Exhibit C - Youtube Interview Transcript, #4 Exhibit D - 623 File History)(North, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 17, 2022 RETURN of #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Franklin M. Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11582464). to attorney for correction re: local counsel not local. (gas)
February 16, 2022 RETURN of #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary L. Pelton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11582420). to attorney for correction re: local counsel not local. (gas)
February 10, 2022 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Franklin M. Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11582464).by Hit Box LLC. (Daniels, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 10, 2022 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary L. Pelton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11582420).by Hit Box LLC. (Daniels, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ON THE PLEADINGS by Hit Box LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief)(Daniels, Steven) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & COUNTERCLAIMS ( Discovery ends on 11/7/2022.), COUNTERCLAIM against Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC with Jury Demand by Hit Box LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B)(Daniels, Steven) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER. Defendant shall have up to and including February 9, 2022 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/04/2022. (sk)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint through 2/9/2022 by Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC, Hit Box LLC (North, John) Modified on 1/3/2022 to correct docket event type and text (sk).
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rsg)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC. (rsg)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Hit Box LLC. (rsg)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11438965) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to JFCA, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC v. Hit Box LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junk Food Custom Arcades, LLC
Represented By: John L. North
Represented By: Martha Logan Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hit Box LLC
Represented By: Franklin M. Smith
Represented By: Steven R. Daniels
Represented By: Zachary L. Pelton
Represented By: Kevin Allen Maxim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?