In Re PFA Insurance Marketing Litigation v. Premier Financial Alliance et al
Plaintiff: In Re PFA Insurance Marketing Litigation
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of The Southwest and Premier Financial Alliance
Respondent: Steven Early
Case Number: 2:2021mi00001
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Steve C Jones
2 Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Transfer to the Court Adjudicating the Underlying Case filed by Steven Early. (rsg)
February 1, 2021 Miscellaneous Case Terminated. Case converted to civil action. All future filings to occur in Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-00029-SCJ-JCF. (rsg)
February 1, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Steven Early re Terminate MI Case and to file in CV case. (rsg)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:21-mi-00001-SCJ-JCF. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/19/21. (rsg)
January 19, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael J. Hassen re #4 Order Reassigning Case. (rsg)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Steven Early to file a response to Plaintiffs' motion no later than 14 days from the date of entry of this Order. Defendants may also file a response no later than 14 days from the date of entry of this Order. Plaintiffs may file a reply no later than 14 days after service of the response(s). The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Steven Early and to counsel for Defendants at the addresses provided on the Certificate of Service (Doc. 1 at 13). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 01/15/2021. (rsg)
January 15, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to attorneys for Life Insurance Company of The Southwest, Premier Financial Alliance, and to Steven Early re #3 Order, #2 General Order. (rsg)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NINTH AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER 20-01 IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/2020. (dgr)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Transfer to the Court Adjudicating the Underlying Case OR, Alternatively, MOTION to Compel Non-Party Steven Early's Compliance with Rule 45 Subpoena by In Re PFA Insurance Marketing Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(dgr) Modified text on 1/14/2021 (rsg).
January 14, 2021 Filing Fee Paid: $ 49, receipt number AGANDC-10601287 (dgr)
January 14, 2021 Submission of #1 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Steven Early's Compliance with Rule 45 Subpoena, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (dgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re PFA Insurance Marketing Litigation v. Premier Financial Alliance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of The Southwest
Represented By: Robert D. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel A. Naor
Represented By: Thomas A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Financial Alliance
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In Re PFA Insurance Marketing Litigation
Represented By: Justin Tharpe Holcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?