Heard v. 2nd Shift Officers, A3
Plaintiff: Robert Soldier Heard
Defendant: 2nd Shift Officers, A3
Case Number: 2:2021mi00007
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 00 U.S.C. ยง 0000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Submission of #2 MOTION to Amend, #3 MOTION to Amend, #4 MOTION to Amend, #5 MOTION to Amend, #6 MOTION to Amend, #7 MOTION to Amend,to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (adg)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Material by Robert Soldier Heard re #1 Notice of Filing Proposed Complaint. (rsg)
May 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Robert Soldier Heard. (rsg)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Robert Soldier Heard. (rsg)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Robert Soldier Heard. (Separate Filing) (rsg)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Robert Soldier Heard. (Separate Filing)(rsg)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Robert Soldier Heard. (Separate Filing) (rsg)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Robert Soldier Heard. (rsg)
May 12, 2021 Submission of #1 Notice of Filing to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (dgr)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE Of Filing Proposed Complaint and 214cv166 Order by Robert Soldier Heard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint)(dgr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heard v. 2nd Shift Officers, A3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Soldier Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2nd Shift Officers, A3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?