United States of America v. A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Fannin County, Georgia et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Fannin County, Georgia, Roger McTaggart and Glenda McTaggart
Case Number: 2:2022cv00055
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 0831 Actions re: rights of Tennessee Valley Authority
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Filing 11 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
April 14, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #9 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by United States of America. (Chase, James) Modified on 4/14/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
April 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Possession)(Chase, James)
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
April 14, 2022 Funds Deposited per Order #7 : $ 10.00, receipt number GAN200005935. (ddm)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Deposit Funds into the Registry of the Court. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 04/12/202. c:Financial Office(ddm)
March 22, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Deposit Funds into the registry of the Court with Brief In Support by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Directing Deposit of Funds, #2 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Order Directing Deposit of Funds)(Chase, James)
March 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America of Completion of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service form for Defendant Roger McTaggart, #2 Certificate of Service form for Defendant Glenda McTaggart)(Chase, James)
March 22, 2022 Docketed per #5 to set answer deadlines: Return of Service Executed by United States of America. Glenda McTaggart served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022; Roger McTaggart served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. (ddm)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:22-cv-00055-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 03/21/22. (rsg)
March 15, 2022 Filing 3 DECLARATION OF TAKING filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Aerial Photograph)(ddm)
March 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by United States of America. (ddm)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Fannin County, Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James S. Chase
Represented By: Lamont A. Belk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Fannin County, Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger McTaggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda McTaggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?